Thaae Resources Company Limited v. A.G. Cooper LLC et al

Plaintiff: Thaae Resources Company Limited
Defendant: Unknown Parties, Mesa Capital Incorporated, Sphinx Construction Limited, Allan G Cooper and A.G. Cooper LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv04654
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to #8 Order regarding amending the complaint, the civil case is terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the complaint is dismissed with leave to amend for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. By July 23, 2019, Plaintiff may file an amended complaint that (1) properly alleges facts from which the Court can determine the citizenship of each party and (2) establishes complete diversity. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint by July 23, 2019, the Clerk of Court shall terminate the action on July 24, 2019 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 7/9/19. (MAW)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Thaae Resources Company Limited. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MFR)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to A.G. Cooper LLC, Allan G Cooper, Mesa Capital Incorporated, Sphinx Construction Limited. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(MFR). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17134657. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-4654-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MFR)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Thaae Resources Company Limited. (Palles, Larry) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(MFR)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Thaae Resources Company Limited. (Palles, Larry) (MFR)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17134657 filed by Thaae Resources Company Limited. (Palles, Larry) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Demand for Jury Trial)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thaae Resources Company Limited v. A.G. Cooper LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mesa Capital Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sphinx Construction Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan G Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.G. Cooper LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thaae Resources Company Limited
Represented By: Steve Wene
Represented By: Larry E Palles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?