Nichols et al v. Marana Stockyard & Livestock Market Incorporated et al
Appellee: Karen Parsons, Dianne C. Kerns, Marana Stockyard & Livestock Market, Inc., Clay Parsons, The Parsons Company, Marana Stockyard & Livestock Market Incorporated and Parsons Company
Appellant: Donald Hugh Nichols and Jane Ann Nichols
Trustee: Dianne C Kerns
Case Number: 2:2019cv04658
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #10 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Donald Hugh Nichols, Jane Ann Nichols, #11 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Donald Hugh Nichols, Jane Ann Nichols. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MSA)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Appellant's Motion to Exceed Page Limit. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 8/12/2019. (TCA)
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 *MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re: #10 Reply to Response to Motion by Donald Hugh Nichols, Jane Ann Nichols. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Yusufov, German) *Modified on 8/12/2019 to correct event type (MSA).
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #4 MOTION to Stay proceedings pending resolution of appeal filed by Donald Hugh Nichols, Jane Ann Nichols. (Yusufov, German)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Expedite Ruling on Appellants' Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Appeal by Marana Stockyard & Livestock Market Incorporated, Clay Parsons, Karen Parsons, Parsons Company. (Petersen, Frederick)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #4 MOTION to Stay proceedings pending resolution of appeal filed by Marana Stockyard & Livestock Market Incorporated, Clay Parsons, Karen Parsons, Parsons Company. (Petersen, Frederick)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Marana Stockyard & Livestock Market Incorporated. (Petersen, Frederick)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Marana Stockyard & Livestock Market Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Marana Stockyard & Livestock Market Incorporated. (Petersen, Frederick)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Stay proceedings pending resolution of appeal by Donald Hugh Nichols, Jane Ann Nichols. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Yusufov, German)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Marana Stockyard & Livestock Market Incorporated. (REK)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Receipt of Bankruptcy Appeal. (REK)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 Transmittal of Appeal/Bankruptcy Matter from Bankruptcy Court. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nichols et al v. Marana Stockyard & Livestock Market Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Karen Parsons
Represented By: David Jeffrey Hindman
Represented By: Frederick Jay Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Dianne C. Kerns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Marana Stockyard & Livestock Market, Inc.
Represented By: David Jeffrey Hindman
Represented By: Frederick Jay Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Clay Parsons
Represented By: David Jeffrey Hindman
Represented By: Frederick Jay Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: The Parsons Company
Represented By: Frederick Jay Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Marana Stockyard & Livestock Market Incorporated
Represented By: Frederick Jay Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Parsons Company
Represented By: Frederick Jay Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Donald Hugh Nichols
Represented By: German Yusufov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Jane Ann Nichols
Represented By: German Yusufov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Dianne C Kerns
Represented By: Craig Alan Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?