Jones v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Plaintiff: Kip Jones
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America, Sabre Incorporated and Sabre Incorporated Group Life Insurance Plan
Case Number: 2:2019cv04669
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER pursuant to #8 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint: Life Insurance Company of North America answer due 9/20/2019. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 8/26/2019. (MMO)
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint (First Request) by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Holmstrom, Kristina)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Kip Jones. Party Sabre Incorporated and Sabre Incorporated Group Life Insurance Plan terminated. (Davis, Scott)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Kip Jones: Return of Service re: Issued Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint with Exhibits "A," "B," "C," and "D," July 10, 2019 Minute Entry and July 10, 2019 Order upon Life Insurance Company of North America on 7/30/2019. (Davis, Scott)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 7/10/2019. (MMO)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (KAH). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17142128. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-04669-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KAH)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Kip Jones. (Davis, Scott) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(KAH)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17142128 filed by Kip Jones. (Davis, Scott) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(KAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Kristina Novotny Holmstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabre Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabre Incorporated Group Life Insurance Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kip Jones
Represented By: Scott Edward Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?