Modulus Financial Engineering Incorporated v. Modulus Data USA Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Modulus Financial Engineering Incorporated
Defendant: Modulus Data Incorporated and Modulus Data USA Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv04685
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Deborah M Fine
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 15 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Modulus Financial Engineering Incorporated: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 07/22/2019 to Modulus Data, Inc. . (Haar, Aaron)
August 13, 2019 Filing 14 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Modulus Financial Engineering Incorporated: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 07/22/2019 to Modulus Data USA, Inc. . (Haar, Aaron)
August 7, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER: That counsel having complied with this Court's Order, the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for August 26, 2019 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order that Modulus Financial Engineering Incorporated show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 8/26/2019 at 04:00 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Modulus Data Incorporated, Modulus Data USA Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Submitted by Modulus Financial Engineering Incorporated. (Haar, Aaron)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Submitted by Modulus Financial Engineering Incorporated. (Haar, Aaron)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Modulus Financial Engineering Incorporated. (Haar, Aaron)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ARC)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(ARC)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17147663. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Deborah M Fine. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-4685-PHX-DMF. Magistrate Election form attached. (ARC)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Modulus Financial Engineering Incorporated. (Haar, Aaron) (ARC)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17147663 filed by Modulus Financial Engineering Incorporated. (Haar, Aaron) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Modulus Financial Engineering Incorporated v. Modulus Data USA Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Modulus Financial Engineering Incorporated
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Dvoren
Represented By: Maria Crimi Speth
Represented By: Aaron K Haar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Modulus Data Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Modulus Data USA Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?