Frantz v. Sun Pharmaceuticals
Plaintiff: Damian Frantz
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceuticals
Case Number: 2:2019cv04693
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #11 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Sun Pharmaceuticals filed by Damian Frantz, and #12 Withdrawal of Document filed by Damian Frantz. Documents are not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RMV)
September 3, 2019 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Damian Frantz: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 09/03/2019 to Christopher Moran, Esq. . (Foster, Troy)
September 3, 2019 Filing 12 *WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT re: #11 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Sun Pharmaceuticals by Plaintiff Damian Frantz. (Foster, Troy) *Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3). Attorney noticed on 9/3/2019 (RMV).
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 *MOTION for Entry of Default as to Sun Pharmaceuticals by Damian Frantz. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Aff/Declaration in Support of Entry of Default)(Foster, Troy) *Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3). Attorney noticed on 9/3/2019 (RMV).
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Damian Frantz: Affidavit of Service re: Complaint, Summons, Orders upon Sun Pharmaceutical via Arizona Corporation Commission on 08/08/2019. (Foster, Troy)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Sun Pharmaceuticals. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Submitted by Damian Frantz. (Foster, Troy)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #6 Summons Submitted filed by Damian Frantz. Summons submitted does not match language from standard summons form. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please use standard summons available at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Submitted by Damian Frantz. (Foster, Troy)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order and its Attachments on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on October 10, 2019, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; 3. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, the parties shall file with the Clerk of Court a notice of service of MIDP Responses, supplemental MIDP Responses, and production of ESI, rather than copies of the actual disclosures [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 7/16/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice - MIDP, #2 MIDP User Manual)(MAW)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Damian Frantz. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17144177. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-4693-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17144177( filed by Damian Frantz.(Foster, Troy) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frantz v. Sun Pharmaceuticals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceuticals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damian Frantz
Represented By: Troy Patrick Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?