Winston v. Aetna Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Mildred Winston
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company, Aetna Incorporated and Aetna Medicaid Administrators LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv04703
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Aetna Medicaid Administrators LLC. (Puma, Michael)
September 6, 2019 Filing 21 Defendants' ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Aetna Medicaid Administrators LLC.(Puma, Michael)
September 5, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Dismiss Defendant Aetna Life Insurance Company, Without Prejudice by Mildred Winston. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Werman, Douglas)
August 27, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Travis M Hedgpeth on behalf of Plaintiff Mildred Winston. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 26, 2019 Filing 19 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Mildred Winston: Proof of Service re: Summons in a Civil Action upon Aetna Medicaid Administrators LLC on 08/26/2019. (Werman, Douglas)
August 26, 2019 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Aetna Medicaid Administrators LLC. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 23, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Submitted by Mildred Winston. (Werman, Douglas)
August 23, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Collective Action Complaint against Aetna Life Insurance Company, Aetna Medicaid Administrators LLC filed by Mildred Winston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent Form)(Werman, Douglas)
August 23, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Mildred Winston . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Amended Complaint)(Werman, Douglas)
August 22, 2019 Filing 14 *NOTICE re: Forthcoming Amended Complaint by Aetna Incorporated, Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Puma, Michael) *Modified to clarify text on 8/23/2019 (RMV).
August 20, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Lauren E Marzullo, Michael J Puma on behalf of Defendants Aetna Incorporated, Aetna Life Insurance Company. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 20, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Jack Siegel on behalf of Plaintiff Mildred Winston. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 19, 2019 Remark: As to out of state counsel Travis M Hedgpeth and Jack Siegel - removed for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 1, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE re: Non-Participating Attorney by Mildred Winston . (Werman, Douglas)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting Parties' Joint Stipulation Regarding Acceptance of Service of Complaint and Extension of Defendants' Time to Respond (Doc. #9 ) and extending Defendants' time to file an answer in response to the Complaint (Doc. #1 ) to August 23, 2019. No further extensions will be granted. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 7/24/19. (JAMA)
July 23, 2019 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Mildred Winston: Proof of Service re: Summons in a Civil Action upon Aetna, Inc. on 07/19/2019. (Werman, Douglas)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Mildred Winston: Proof of Service re: Summons in a Civil Action upon Aetna Life Insurance Company on 07/19/2019. (Werman, Douglas)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT Joint Stipulation Regarding Acceptance of Service of Complaint and Extension of Defendants' Time to Respond (First Request) by Aetna Incorporated, Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Brockelman, Kent)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 *NOTICE of Appearance by Kent S Brockelman and Jill Johnson Chasson on behalf of Aetna Incorporated, Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Brockelman, Kent) *Modified to add attorney on 7/24/2019 (RMV).
July 22, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motions granted for Douglas M Werman, Sarah J Arendt and Maureen A Salas on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action shall be dismissed without further notice after October 11, 2019, unless before then Plaintiff has properly served Defendant with the Summons and Complaint and has filed with the Clerk of the Court proof thereof pursuant to Rule 4(l) or has shown good cause for the failure to timely serve. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 7/15/19. (JAMA)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 7/15/19. (JAMA)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Aetna Incorporated, Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ARC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ARC)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17154935. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-4703-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Mildred Winston. (Bendau, Clifford) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ARC)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17154935 filed by Mildred Winston. (Bendau, Clifford) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winston v. Aetna Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Kent S Brockelman
Represented By: Michael J Puma
Represented By: Jill Johnson Chasson
Represented By: Lauren E Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Incorporated
Represented By: Kent S Brockelman
Represented By: Michael J Puma
Represented By: Jill Johnson Chasson
Represented By: Lauren E Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Medicaid Administrators LLC
Represented By: Kent S Brockelman
Represented By: Michael J Puma
Represented By: Jill Johnson Chasson
Represented By: Lauren E Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mildred Winston
Represented By: Maureen A Salas
Represented By: Zachary C Flowerree
Represented By: Travis M Hedgpeth
Represented By: Clifford Phillip Bendau, II
Represented By: Sarah J Arendt
Represented By: Douglas M Werman
Represented By: Jack Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?