Fallon v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Mya Noelia Fallon
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv04704
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Daniel Talbert appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Talbert, Daniel)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Mya Noelia Fallon: Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons and Complaint upon Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security Administration on 07/25/19, 07/30/19, 07/23/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Receipt for Service on Attorney General, #2 Exhibit Receipt for Service on U.S. Attorney, #3 Exhibit Receipt for Service on Office of General Counsel)(Schiffman, Anna)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAS)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER (See attachment for details). Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/15/19. (CLB)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service by waiver or of the summons and complaint. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/15/19. (CLB)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J. Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: 19-4704-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Mya Noelia Fallon. (Schiffman, Anna) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(KEP)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Mya Noelia Fallon. (Schiffman, Anna) (KEP)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Mya Noelia Fallon. (Schiffman, Anna) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fallon v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mya Noelia Fallon
Represented By: Alan M Schiffman
Represented By: Anna Tucker Schiffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Daniel P Talbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?