Rightsell v. Concentric Healthcare Solutions LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kendra Rightsell
Defendant: Chris Bollinger, Andrew Jacobs, Concentric Healthcare Solutions LLC, Unkown Silk, Unknown Parties, Unknown Bollinger, Kyle Silk and Unknown Jacobs
Case Number: 2:2019cv04713
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Kendra Rightsell: Return of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Notice of Availabilityof a U.S. Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdication, Notice to Parties - MIDP, and General Order upon Andrew Jacobs and Jennifer Jacobs on 8/28/2019. (Bonnett, Daniel)
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Kendra Rightsell: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 8/21/2019 to Susanne Ingold on behalf of Defendants Concentric Healthcare Solutions, LLC; Kyle Silk and Jane Doe Silk; and Chris Bollinger and Jane Doe Bollinger . (Bonnett, Daniel)
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Unknown Bollinger, Andrew Jacobs, Unknown Jacobs, Kyle Silk, Unkown Silk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER/NOTICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(m) - ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 (m) on October 14, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 7/15/19. (EJA)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #2 Summons Submitted filed by Kendra Rightsell. Unable to issue summonses as to Kyle Silk, Jane Doe Silk, Jane Doe Bollinger, Andrew Jacobs, Jane Doe Jacobs summonses must list defendants address on each form, where indicated. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Chris Bollinger, Concentric Healthcare Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Submitted by Kendra Rightsell. (Bonnett, Daniel) (BAC)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Chris Bollinger, Concentric Healthcare Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16155169. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-04713-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.(BAC)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Kendra Rightsell. (Bonnett, Daniel) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(BAC)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-16155169 filed by Kendra Rightsell. (Bonnett, Daniel) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rightsell v. Concentric Healthcare Solutions LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Bollinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concentric Healthcare Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unkown Silk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Bollinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Silk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendra Rightsell
Represented By: Daniel Lee Bonnett
Represented By: Michael Martin Licata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?