Clayton et al v. Heil Company Incorporated
Plaintiff: Sabrina Clayton, Christina Clayton and Phillip K Clayton
Defendant: Heil Company Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv04724
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John Z Boyle
Referring Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting the parties' Stipulated Motion. Heil Co. d/b/a Heil Environmental shall have a one-time extension to October 7, 2019 to file its response to Plaintiffs' Complaint. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/5/2019. (SST)
September 5, 2019 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint Stipulated Motion to Extend Time For The Heil Co. d/b/a Heil Environmental To File A Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint (First Request) by Heil Company Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Zimmerman, Joshua)
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Christina Clayton, Phillip K Clayton, Sabrina Clayton: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice to Parties Mandatory Initial Discovery Project, Minute Order upon Heil Environmental on 08/16/2019. (Osborne, John)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Christina Clayton, Phillip K Clayton, Sabrina Clayton: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Consent to Exercise Jurisdiction, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice to Parties Mandatory Initial Discovery Project, Minute Order upon Heil Co. on 08/16/2019. (Osborne, John)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - The Clerk shall terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on 10/14/2019. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 7/18/19. (DXD)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge G. Murray Snow. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-19-4724-PHX-GMS. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Heil Company Incorporated and Heil Environmental. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(DLC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17163203. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John Z Boyle. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-4724-PHX-JZB. Magistrate Election form attached. (DLC)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Heil Company Incorporated. (Osborne, John) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(DLC)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17163203 filed by Phillip K Clayton, Christina Clayton, and Sabrina Clayton. (Osborne, John) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clayton et al v. Heil Company Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Clayton
Represented By: Kristin Jennifer Schriner
Represented By: William C Bacon
Represented By: John Edwards Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Clayton
Represented By: Kristin Jennifer Schriner
Represented By: William C Bacon
Represented By: John Edwards Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip K Clayton
Represented By: Kristin Jennifer Schriner
Represented By: William C Bacon
Represented By: John Edwards Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heil Company Incorporated
Represented By: Joshua Robert Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?