Camberos v. Ryan et al
Petitioner: Edgar Alfonso Camberos
Respondent: Charles L Ryan and Arizona Department of Corrections
Case Number: 2:2019cv04730
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: James F Metcalf (PS)
Referring Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's Order filed August 15, 2019, Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U. S. C. 2241 is denied. Petitioner to take nothing and this action is hereby dismissed. (EJA)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Petitioner's Petition Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 (Doc. #1 ) is denied and this case is dismissed. The Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 8/15/19. (EJA)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number PHX210753. (SLQ)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: 3 Notice of Receipt of E-Service by AZ AG. Document entered in wrong case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile document in correct case. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (EJA)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 *FILED in wrong case. See deficiency at 4 * Notice of Receipt of Electronic Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Arizona Attorney General on 7/15/19. The Attorney General's Office will file a Notice of Appearance within five (5) business days that identifies the respondents that are represented or, in the alternative, will notify the Court if the Attorney General is not able to accept service for and/or represent any of the named respondents. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Sparks, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/2/2019 (SLQ).
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (EJA)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254) filed by Edgar Alfonso Camberos. (10 pages) (Attachments: #1 envelope)(EJA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Camberos v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Arizona Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Edgar Alfonso Camberos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?