TLX Incorporated v. JetBlue Airways Corporation
Plaintiff: TLX Incorporated
Defendant: JetBlue Airways Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv04734
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Stipulation : Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss no later than September 19, 2019. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 9/12/2019. (TCA)
September 11, 2019 Filing 22 STIPULATION re: #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by TLX Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Frutkin, Jonathan)
August 29, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by JetBlue Airways Corporation. (Goodwin, Nicole)
August 16, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #18 Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery filed by TLX Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 5.5(g) - Documents signed by an attorney shall be filed using that attorney's ECF log-in and password and shall not be filed using a log-in and password belonging to another attorney. Document(s) signed by attorney Jonathan Frutkin but submitted using the log-in and password belonging to attorney John Gilbert. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MSA)
August 15, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff TLX Incorporated. (Frutkin, Jonathan)
August 15, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff TLX Incorporated. (Gilbert, John)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Defendant shall respond to Plaintiffs Complaint no later than August 29, 2019. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 8/6/2019. (TCA)
August 6, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JetBlue Airways Corporation. (Goodwin, Nicole)
August 5, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION (Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadline for Defendant to Respond to Complaint) by JetBlue Airways Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodwin, Nicole)
August 2, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE re: of Service by TLX Incorporated re: #12 Order re Rule 12(b) Motions . (Himmelstein, Ben)
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by TLX Incorporated: Proof of Service re: Summons in a Civil Action upon JetBlue Airways Corporation on 7/18/2019. (Frutkin, Jonathan)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 7/17/2019. (TCA)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on October 14, 2019. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 7/17/2019. (TCA)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to JetBlue Airways Corporation. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: 8 Notice of Deficiency (Text Only), 6 Notice of Deficiency (Text Only), 7 Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) by Plaintiff TLX Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Frutkin, Jonathan)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #3 Summons Submitted filed by TLX Incorporated. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile the Summons, to include an address. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by TLX Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by TLX Incorporated. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile the civil cover sheet using the correct format. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17167996. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-04734-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.(BAC)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by TLX Incorporated. (Frutkin, Jonathan) (BAC)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TLX Incorporated.(BAC)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-17167996 filed by TLX Incorporated. (Frutkin, Jonathan) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice to Parties)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TLX Incorporated v. JetBlue Airways Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TLX Incorporated
Represented By: Jonathan B Frutkin
Represented By: Ben Joshua Himmelstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JetBlue Airways Corporation
Represented By: Nicole Maroulakos Goodwin
Represented By: Aaron Thomas Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?