Kalologie Spa Destinations LLC v. Healing Harbor Holdings LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kalologie Spa Destinations LLC
Defendant: Dawn R Kyl, David Owers, Vermillion Aesthetics LLC, Rene Kyle and Healing Harbor Holdings LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv04739
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Kalologie Spa Destinations LLC. (Benveniste, Katherine)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Pursuant to the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Doc. #19 ), IT IS ORDERED that this matter is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i). FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 7/23/19. (MAP)
July 19, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kalologie Spa Destinations LLC. (Sixkiller, Laura)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Plaintiff's Request for Emergency Telephonic Status Conference #15 is denied. See order for details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 7/19/2019. (LMR)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER on #13 , #11 Notice: The briefing schedule set on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction remains and the Court will take no further action at this time. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 7/18/2019. (LMR)
July 18, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE re: EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR EMERGENCY TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE by Kalologie Spa Destinations LLC re: #15 Motion for Hearing. (Sixkiller, Laura) *Modified text on 7/19/2019 (DXD).
July 18, 2019 Filing 15 *MOTION for Hearing or Conference re: Emergency Telephonic Status Conference by Plaintiff Kalologie Spa Destinations LLC. (Sixkiller, Laura) *Modified to correct event on 7/19/2019 (DXD).
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRELIMINARY ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motion to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. Unless the Court orders otherwise, on October 15, 2019, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not beenserved pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 7/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(LMR)
July 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Errata re: #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Kalologie Spa Destinations LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction With Notice)(Sixkiller, Laura)
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Kalologie Spa Destinations LLC: Proof of Service re: Complaint, Summons, MOT for TRO and Preliminary Injunction, Order Granting PLTF MOT for TRO and Preliminary Injunction; PLTF Corporate Disclosure Statement; NOT to Parties of MIDPP upon Vermillion Aesthetics LLC on 7-18-2019. (Sixkiller, Laura)
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE re: PROOF OF NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Kalologie Spa Destinations LLC re: #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of Laura Sixkiller)(Sixkiller, Laura)
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Kalologie Spa Destinations LLC: Proof of Service re: Complaint, Summons, MTN TRO and Preliminary Injunction, PLTF Corporate Disclosure Statement, NOT to Parties MIDPP upon Rene Kyle on 07-17-2019. (Sixkiller, Laura)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order: Plaintiff's Motion #2 is denied to the extent that it requests issuance of a Temporary Restraining Order. By 7/22/2019, Plaintiff must serve a copy on Defendants and file proof of service with the Court of the following: (1) the Complaint; (2) the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction; and (3) this Order. Defendants shall have 30 days from the date of service of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction to file a Response. Plaintiff shall have 14 days from the date of service of Defendants' Response to file a Reply. See order for additional details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 7/18/2019. (LMR)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (KAH). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121) (KAH)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KAH)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17173098. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-04739-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KAH)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kalologie Spa Destinations LLC. (Sixkiller, Laura) (KAH)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Kalologie Spa Destinations LLC. (Sixkiller, Laura) (KAH)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Kalologie Spa Destinations LLC. (Sixkiller, Laura) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (KAH). *Modified to add motion part on 7/18/2019 (DXD).
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (TRO Requested). Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17173098 filed by Kalologie Spa Destinations LLC. (Sixkiller, Laura) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5, #2 Exhibit 6-9, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(KAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kalologie Spa Destinations LLC v. Healing Harbor Holdings LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn R Kyl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Owers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vermillion Aesthetics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rene Kyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healing Harbor Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kalologie Spa Destinations LLC
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Sixkiller
Represented By: Kyle Thomas Orne
Represented By: Katherine L Benveniste
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?