Terrin v. Razor USA LLC et al
Plaintiff: Michael C Terrin
Defendant: Razor USA LLC and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2019cv04740
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Michael C Terrin. (Tonkin, Timothy)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Michael C Terrin. (Tonkin, Timothy)
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Michael C Terrin. (Tonkin, Timothy)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Razor USA LLC. (Wheeler, Travis)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #8 Answer to Complaint filed by Razor USA LLC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 5.5(g) - Documents signed by an attorney shall be filed using that attorney's ECF log-in and password and shall not be filed using a log-in and password belonging to another attorney. Document(s) signed by attorney Travis Wheeler but submitted using the log-in and password belonging to attorney Amanda Heitz. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Razor USA LLC.(Heitz, Amanda)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Razor USA LLC. (Wheeler, Travis)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Scheduling Conference is set for 10/3/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. See attachment for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/19/19. (CLB)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Timothy Gary Tonkin. (Tonkin, Timothy)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Razor USA LLC. (MFR)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17173204. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-4740-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MFR)
July 17, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED : Certificate of Service re: Summons, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration, Complaint upon Razor USA LLC on 6/17/2019 (original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 6/19/2019). (MFR) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-008346. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17173204 filed by Razor USA LLC. (Wheeler, Travis) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terrin v. Razor USA LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Razor USA LLC
Represented By: Travis Monroe Wheeler
Represented By: Amanda Emily Heitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael C Terrin
Represented By: Kimberly Jean Sayre
Represented By: Timothy Gary Tonkin
Represented By: Kurt Dale Maahs
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?