Elam v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Robyn P Elam
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv04773
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Referring Judge: Eileen S Willett
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE TRIAL. Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett added. Chief Judge G Murray Snow no longer assigned to case. All further pleadings shall list the following case number: CV-19-4773-PHX-ESW. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 8/29/19. (MAP)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Robyn P Elam: Notice of Service re: Summons upon William Barr, US Attorney General (08/13/19); Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of the Social Security Administration (08/09/19); Michael Bailey, US Attorney for the District of Arizona (08/06/19) on 08/13/19; 08/09/19; 08/06/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Domestic return receipts and certified mail receipts)(Caldwell, Mark)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ben Porter appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Porter, Ben)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (BAS)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER issued. Please review Order for details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 7/22/19. (SJF)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER/NOTICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(m). ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 (m) on October 17, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 7/22/19. (MAP)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, without prepayment of costs or fees or the necessity of giving security therefore. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service by waiver or of the summons and complaint. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 7/22/19. (MAP)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-04773-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAC)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Robyn P Elam. (Caldwell, Mark) (BAC)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Robyn P Elam. (Caldwell, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BAC)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Robyn P Elam. (Caldwell, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elam v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robyn P Elam
Represented By: Mark Ross Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Ben Alexander Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?