Berneking v. Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Lisa Berneking
Defendant: Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv04788
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Deborah M Fine
Referring Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Eric F Au on behalf of Defendant Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/11/2019 at 01:00 PM, Fifth Floor, Sandra Day O'Connor U.S. Federal Courthouse, 401 W. Washington St., Phoenix, Arizona 85003-2151. Joint Proposed Case Management Plan due by not less than ten (10) days before the Scheduling Conference. (See attached order for additional information.) Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 8/29/2019. (RMW)
August 29, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company.(Pont, Ryan)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 IT IS ORDERED vacating the Rule 16 scheduling conference set for September 26, 2019, to be reset by separate order. Ordered by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 8/13/2019. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CLB)
August 7, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge James A. Teilborg. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-19-4788-PHX-JAT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED The Scheduling Conference date is affirmed unless reset by separate order. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. (Pont, Ryan)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 9/26/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 304, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine. See document for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 7/30/19. (MSA)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting the parties' #5 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint and allowing a one-time extension of time to respond to complaint by 30 days. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the 30-day extension. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 7/30/19. (MSA)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Myles, Donald)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. (KEP)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17193048. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Deborah M. Fine. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-4788-PHX-DMF. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (KEP)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-095015. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17193048 filed by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company. (Pont, Ryan) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berneking v. Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Berneking
Represented By: Mark W Arnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Ryan D Pont
Represented By: Donald L Myles, Jr.
Represented By: Eric F Au
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?