Nelson v. Arthrex Incorporated
Plaintiff: Vikki Nelson
Defendant: Arthrex Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv04810
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michelle H Burns
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #10 ,Civil Case Terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Vikki Nelson. (Parilman, Joshua)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order that Vikki Nelson show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 9/3/2019 at 04:30 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 *Additional Attachment to Main Document - Civil Cover Sheet - filed by Vikki Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Parilman, Joshua) *Modified to correct event; attorney noticed on 7/25/2019. The filing of an amended complaint was not requested. (SLQ).
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Vikki Nelson. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1 (a)(1) - Attorney name and Information must be typewritten or printed in the space to the left of the center of the page and beginning at line 1 on the first page. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MFR)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Vikki Nelson. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MFR)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Arthrex Incorporated. (MFR). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17200350. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michelle H Burns. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-4810-PHX-MHB. Magistrate Election form attached. (MFR)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Vikki Nelson. (Parilman, Joshua) (MFR)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17200350 filed by Vikki Nelson. (Parilman, Joshua) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Arthrex Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthrex Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vikki Nelson
Represented By: Michael P McGartland
Represented By: Joshua Seth Parilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?