Menges v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Trupe Menges
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv04829
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Daniel Keenan Ryan on behalf of Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen William Tully on behalf of Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Tully, Stephen)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 * SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Trupe Menges: Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 8/7/19 to Hartford Accident and Life Insurance Company. (Roeschke, Kiel) * Modified to clarify what type of service, who was served and the date the waiver was sent on 8/9/2019 (LAD).
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 7/29/2019. (MMO)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17206328. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 19-4829 PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Trupe Menges. (Roeschke, Kiel) (MCO)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17206328 filed by Trupe Menges. (Roeschke, Kiel) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Menges v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel Keenan Ryan
Represented By: Brett B Larsen
Represented By: Stephen William Tully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trupe Menges
Represented By: Kiel John Roeschke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?