Broadcast Music Incorporated et al v. Baja Joe's LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mow B'Jow Music Incorporated, EMI Consortium Songs Incorporated, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation, Broadcast Music Incorporated, Dandelion Music Company, EMI Blackwood Music Incorporated, Rick Springfield Music, Cyanide Publishing and Universal-Songs of Polygram International Incorporated
Defendant: Baja Joe's LLC, Baja Joe, Sean M Smith Living Trust and Sean M Smith
Case Number: 2:2019cv04864
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 13 STATUS REPORT by Broadcast Music Incorporated, Cyanide Publishing, Dandelion Music Company, EMI Blackwood Music Incorporated, EMI Consortium Songs Incorporated, Mow B'Jow Music Incorporated, Rick Springfield Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Universal-Songs of Polygram International Incorporated, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation. (Deatherage, Mark)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: After review of the docket, the Court notes that service on Defendants was made on August 18, 2019. No answers have been filed and no applications for entry of default have been made. IT IS ORDERED that counsel for the Plaintiffs file a status report within 7 days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the matter will be dismissed without further notice 7 days from the date of this Order if counsel fails to file a status report. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 9/12/19. (MAW)
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Broadcast Music Incorporated, Cyanide Publishing, Dandelion Music Company, EMI Blackwood Music Incorporated, EMI Consortium Songs Incorporated, Mow B'Jow Music Incorporated, Rick Springfield Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Universal-Songs of Polygram International Incorporated, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, MIDP upon Sean M. Smith Living Trust on August 18, 2019. (Deatherage, Mark)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Broadcast Music Incorporated, Cyanide Publishing, Dandelion Music Company, EMI Blackwood Music Incorporated, EMI Consortium Songs Incorporated, Mow B'Jow Music Incorporated, Rick Springfield Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Universal-Songs of Polygram International Incorporated, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, MIDP upon Sean M. Smith on August 18, 2019. (Deatherage, Mark)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Broadcast Music Incorporated, Cyanide Publishing, Dandelion Music Company, EMI Blackwood Music Incorporated, EMI Consortium Songs Incorporated, Mow B'Jow Music Incorporated, Rick Springfield Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Universal-Songs of Polygram International Incorporated, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, MIDP upon Baja Joe's LLC on August 18, 2019. (Deatherage, Mark)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Broadcast Music Incorporated, Cyanide Publishing, Dandelion Music Company, EMI Blackwood Music Incorporated, EMI Consortium Songs Incorporated, Mow B'Jow Music Incorporated, Rick Springfield Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Universal-Songs of Polygram International Incorporated, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation. (Deatherage, Mark)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(DLC)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Baja Joe's LLC, Sean M Smith Living Trust and Sean M Smith. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(DLC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17225608. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan R Bolton. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-4864-PHX-SRB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Broadcast Music Incorporated, Cyanide Publishing, Dandelion Music Company, EMI Blackwood Music Incorporated, EMI Consortium Songs Incorporated, Mow B'Jow Music Incorporated, Rick Springfield Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Universal-Songs of Polygram International Incorporated, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation. (Deatherage, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(DLC)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music Incorporated, Cyanide Publishing, Dandelion Music Company, EMI Blackwood Music Incorporated, EMI Consortium Songs Incorporated, Mow B'Jow Music Incorporated, Rick Springfield Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Universal-Songs of Polygram International Incorporated, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation. (Deatherage, Mark) (DLC)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17225608 filed by Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation, Mow B'Jow Music Incorporated, Dandelion Music Company, Universal-Songs of Polygram International Incorporated, EMI Consortium Songs Incorporated, Broadcast Music Incorporated, Cyanide Publishing, EMI Blackwood Music Incorporated, Rick Springfield Music. (Deatherage, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music Incorporated et al v. Baja Joe's LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baja Joe's LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baja Joe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean M Smith Living Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean M Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mow B'Jow Music Incorporated
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Consortium Songs Incorporated
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corporation
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music Incorporated
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dandelion Music Company
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Blackwood Music Incorporated
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Springfield Music
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cyanide Publishing
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal-Songs of Polygram International Incorporated
Represented By: Mark M Deatherage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?