Silva v. Butori Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Sergio Silva
Defendant: Lisa Cvijanovich, Richard Cvijanovich and Butori Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv04904
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michael T Liburdi
Referring Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for Monday, 11/18/2019 at 09:30 AM, in Courtroom 504. The parties must jointly file the Joint Proposed Case Management Report with the Clerk of the Court at least 10 days before the Scheduling Conference. See attached order for additional information. Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 10/4/2019. (RMW)
October 4, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Butori Corporation, Lisa Cvijanovich, Richard Cvijanovich.(Lynn, Douglas)
October 4, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #14 Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel filed by Sergio Silva. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 5.5(g) - Documents signed by an attorney shall be filed using that attorney's ECF log-in and password and shall not be filed using a log-in and password belonging to another attorney. Document(s) signed by attorney Jennifer Murphey but submitted using the log-in and password belonging to attorney Daniel Bonnett. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (GMP)
October 3, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Leigh Eric Dowell on behalf of Butori Corporation, Lisa Cvijanovich, Richard Cvijanovich. (Dowell, Leigh)
October 3, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Lee Bonnett on behalf of Sergio Silva. (Bonnett, Daniel)
September 18, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER: This case is reassigned to Judge Michael T. Liburdi. All future filings shall reflect the following case number: CV-19-4904-PHX-MTL. All pending hearings and/or deadlines are AFFIRMED unless reset by separate order. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
September 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE re: Service of Court's Preliminary Order (Doc. 6) by Sergio Silva . (Bonnett, Daniel)
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Sergio Silva: Return of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Notice of Availability of US Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction, Notice of the Parties - MIDP, and Preliminary Order upon Butori Corp. on 08/15/2019. (Bonnett, Daniel)
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Sergio Silva: Return of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Notice of Availability of US Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction, Notice of the Parties - MIDP, and Preliminary Order upon Lisa Cvijanovich on 08/10/2019. (Bonnett, Daniel)
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Sergio Silva: Return of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Notice of Availability of US Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction, Notice of the Parties - MIDP, and Preliminary Order upon Richard Cvijanovich on 08/10/2019. (Bonnett, Daniel)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Stipulation #7 is granted. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. Defendants' time to respond to the complaint is extended to October 4, 2019. No further extensions will be granted Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 9/5/2019. (LMR)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Butori Corporation, Lisa Cvijanovich, Richard Cvijanovich. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lynn, Douglas)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRELIMINARY ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motion to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. Unless the Court orders otherwise, on November 5, 2019, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 8/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(LMR)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Butori Corporation, Richard Cvijanovich and Lisa Cvijanovich. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(DLC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17248950. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-4904-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Sergio Silva. (Bonnett, Daniel) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(DLC)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17248950 filed by Sergio Silva. (Bonnett, Daniel) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silva v. Butori Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Cvijanovich
Represented By: Douglas Calvin Lynn, III
Represented By: Leigh Eric Dowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Cvijanovich
Represented By: Douglas Calvin Lynn, III
Represented By: Leigh Eric Dowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butori Corporation
Represented By: Douglas Calvin Lynn, III
Represented By: Leigh Eric Dowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Silva
Represented By: Daniel Lee Bonnett
Represented By: Michael Martin Licata
Represented By: Jennifer Nicole Murphey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?