Calhoun v. Allstate Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Ateka Calhoun
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Holdings LLC, Unknown Parties, Allstate Insurance and Allstate Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv04932
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Camille D Bibles
Referring Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Fact Discovery due by 5/29/2020. Dispositive motions due by 11/6/2020. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/30/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/6/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 502, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Susan R Bolton. Jury Trial set for 4/13/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 502, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Susan R Bolton. See attachment for further details. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 10/9/19. (CLB)
October 8, 2019 Filing 19 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Senior Judge Susan R Bolton: Case Management Conference held on 10/8/2019. Deadlines and hearing dates are discussed. Case Management Order to follow. Plaintiff requests the Court amend the case caption to reflect Allstate Insurance Company as named Defendant. The Court grants the oral request and orders the Clerk's Office to amend the case caption. There being no fictitious defendants listed in the Amended Complaint (Doc. #7 ), the Court orders the termination of the Unknown Parties reflected on the docket. APPEARANCES: David Williams for Plaintiff. Telephonic appearance by J. Scott Humphrey for Defendant. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams.) Hearing held 10:58 AM to 11:12 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CLB)
September 26, 2019 Filing 18 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Ateka Calhoun. (Williams, David)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Case Management Conference is set for October 8, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 502, Sandra Day O'Connor U.S. Federal Courthouse, 401 W. Washington St., Phoenix, Arizona 85003-2151 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 9/4/19. (MAW)
September 4, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by Allstate Insurance Company.(Humphrey, J)
August 23, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Susan R Bolton. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-19-4932-PHX-SRB. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 22, 2019 Filing 15 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 22, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Katelyn Miller on behalf of Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 22, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for J Scott Humphrey on behalf of Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation, Corporate Parent Allstate Insurance Holdings, LLC for Allstate Insurance Company. (Vandewater, Melissa)
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Vandewater on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company. (Vandewater, Melissa)
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Allstate Insurance Company. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Submitted by Ateka Calhoun. (Williams, David)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Ateka Calhoun. Party Allstate Insurance Holdings LLC (a Delaware corporation) terminated. (Williams, David)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Allstate Insurance Company filed by Ateka Calhoun.(Williams, David)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Insurance Holdings LLC identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation for Allstate Insurance Holdings LLC. (Vandewater, Melissa)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Allstate Insurance Holdings LLC. (BAC)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Allstate Insurance Holdings LLC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c) - Documents shall be converted to PDF directly from a word processing program and per Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual must be text searchable. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number CV2019-007541. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Camille D Bibles. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-04932-PHX-CDB. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions.(BAC)
August 12, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED: Service of Process re: Amended Summons, Cover Sheet, Certificate of Service, First Amended Complaint upon The Corporation Trust Company, Wilmington, DE on 7/11/19. (BAC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-007541. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-17264301 filed by Allstate Insurance Holdings LLC. (Vandewater, Melissa) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Cover Sheet)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calhoun v. Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Holdings LLC
Represented By: Katelyn Miller
Represented By: J Scott Humphrey
Represented By: Melissa Vandewater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance
Represented By: Katelyn Miller
Represented By: J Scott Humphrey
Represented By: Melissa Vandewater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Katelyn Miller
Represented By: J Scott Humphrey
Represented By: Melissa Vandewater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ateka Calhoun
Represented By: David Wendell Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?