Bond v. Azar
Plaintiff: Neil Rusty Bond
Defendant: Alex M Azar and Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv04933
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 12 Prisoner documents received: 3 USM-285s addressed to Andrew Saul, 3 Summonses addressed to Andrew Saul, 2 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waiver Summons addressed to Deborah L Stachel, 2 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waiver Summons addressed to William Barr, 2 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waiver Summons addressed to Michael Baxley, 5 Waiver of Service of Summons forms, including copies of Amended Complaint #9 . No copies of Service Order #10 were provided. (LAD)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - Within sixty (60) days after the answer is filed, Plaintiff must file an opening brief addressing why the Commissioner's decision is not supported by substantial evidence or why the decision should otherwise be reversed or the case remanded. Defendant must file an answering brief within thirty (30) days after service of Plaintiffs opening brief. Plaintiff may file a reply brief within fifteen (15) days after service of Defendant's answering brief. See document for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 9/6/19. (MSA)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER (Service Packet): IT IS ORDERED that service by waiver or service of the summons and complaint shall be at government expense on the defendant by the U.S. Marshal or his authorized representative. The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet including the Amended Complaint (Doc. #9 ), this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for the Defendant. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 30 days of the date of filing of this Order. The United States Marshal will not provide service of process if Plaintiff fails to comply with this Order. See document for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 9/5/2019. (RMV)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Neil Rusty Bond.(GMP)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff, if he chooses, shall file an amended complaint by 9/3/2019. If Plaintiff does not file an amended complaint by this deadline, the Court will screen the original complaint (Doc. #1 ) as indicated in the 8/14/2019 Order. (See attached Order for additional information.) Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 8/23/2019. (RMW) *Modified document type from standard to written opinion on 8/26/2019 (EJA).
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Neil Rusty Bond: Certified Mail Receipt re: complaint upon United States Attorney General, Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, U.S. Attorney - District of Arizona on 8/16/19, 8/12/19 and 8/12/19. (EJA)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Neil Rusty Bond. (5 pages) (RMV)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that by August 29, 2019, Plaintiff shall either pay the filing fee or file a complete application to proceed in forma pauperis. If Plaintiff fails to take either of these actions by August 29, 2019, the Clerk of the Court s hall enter judgment dismissing this case without prejudice. If in forma pauperis status is later granted, this Court will screen the complaint as discussed above. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 8/14/19. (CLB)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (RMV)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Senior Judge James A Teilborg. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-04933-PHX-JAT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (RMV)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Neil Rusty Bond. (2 pages) (RMV)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Neil Rusty Bond. (84 pages) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(RMV)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bond v. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil Rusty Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?