O'Boyle v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Kristina O'Boyle
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2019cv04938
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michelle H Burns
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 21 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party John Does I-V Jane Does I-V Black Corporation I-V White Partnerships I-V STIPULATION AND MOTION TO DISMISS FICTITIOUS DEFENDANTS by Kristina O'Boyle. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schmidt, Eric)
October 9, 2019 Filing 20 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT filed by Plaintiff Kristina O'Boyle. (Schmidt, Eric)
October 1, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric William Schmidt on behalf of Kristina O'Boyle. (Schmidt, Eric)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PROTECTIVE AND CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER - See document for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 9/30/19. (MSA)
September 26, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION for Protective & Confidentiality Order by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Order)(Belanger, John)
September 25, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Kristina O'Boyle. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Oswalt, Sandra)
September 24, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #14 Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery filed by Kristina O'Boyle. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MSA)
September 23, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Kristina O'Boyle. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration)(Oswalt, Sandra)
September 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Belanger, John)
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 Minute Order: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for October 7, 2019 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
September 11, 2019 Filing 11 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order that Kristina O'Boyle show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 10/7/2019 at 04:30 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Scheduling Conference set for 10/16/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 303, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns. See document for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 8/22/19. (MSA)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Costco Wholesale Corporation.(Belanger, John)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17267538. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michelle H Burns. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-4938-PHX-MHB. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (DLC)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Campbell, Adam) (DLC)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-004420. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17267538 filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Campbell, Adam) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Boyle v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Adam B Campbell
Represented By: John Joseph Belanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristina O'Boyle
Represented By: Sandra Christine Oswalt
Represented By: John Dallas Yohe
Represented By: Eric William Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?