Sowers v. Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Rick Sowers
Defendant: MetLife Auto & Home, Unknown Parties, MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency Incorporated, Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company and Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv04941
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Eileen S Willett
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company. (Fleming, Elizabeth)
October 10, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Rick Sowers. (Powers, Frank)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference set for 11/6/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 305, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett. See document for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 10/02/2019. (REK)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED granting the Amended Stipulation (Doc. #6 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED dismissing Defendants Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company, MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc., and MetLife Auto & Home only. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company remains as the sole defendant in this action and all future captions shall be amended accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 9/11/19. (SLQ)
September 10, 2019 Filing 14 Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company's ANSWER to Complaint by Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company.(Fleming, Elizabeth)
September 10, 2019 Filing 13 Minute Order: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for October 7, 2019 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order that Rick Sowers show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 10/7/2019 at 04:30 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (MAP)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parents MetLife Incorporated and Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company for Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company. (Fleming, Elizabeth) *Modified to add additional corporate parent on 8/27/2019 (REK).
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 *AMENDED STIPULATION of Dismissal (re: Parties Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company, MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency Incorporated, MetLife Auto and Home) by MetLife Auto & Home, MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency Incorporated, Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company, Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fleming, Elizabeth) *Modified to correct event on 8/16/2019 (REK).
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 *STIPULATION of Dismissal (as to Joint Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company, MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency Incorporated, and MetLife Auto & Home)by MetLife Auto & Home, MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency Incorporated, Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company, Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fleming, Elizabeth) *Modified to correct event and text on 8/16/2019 (REK).
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to MetLife Auto & Home, MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency Incorporated, Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company, Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (MCO)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17268865. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eileen S Willett. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-4941-PHX-ESW. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (MCO)
August 13, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED : Acceptance of Service re: Complaint/Certificate of Arbitration/Jury Demand/Summons upon Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company, MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency, Inc. aka MetLife Auto & Home, Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company on 7/23/2019. (MCO) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019 0010626. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17268865 filed by MetLife Auto & Home, Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company, MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency Incorporated. (Fleming, Elizabeth) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sowers v. Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MetLife Auto & Home
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MetLife Auto & Home Insurance Agency Incorporated
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Sowers
Represented By: Frank Ignatius Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?