Meyers v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Plaintiff: Melissa Meyers
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Case Number: 2:2019cv04942
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John Z Boyle
Referring Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rademaekers, Iwana)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 10/2/2019. (TCA)
October 1, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Susan M Brnovich. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-19-4942-PHX-SMB. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for October 21, 2019 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 *Order that Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 10/21/2019 at 04:30 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (MAP) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/30/2019: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form) (MAP). *Modified to add attachments on 9/30/2019 (MAP). NEF regenerated on 9/30/19 (NKS)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The Stipulation (Doc. #8 ) is granted. Defendant shall have up to, and including, October 11, 2019 to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 9/13/2019. (SST)
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rademaekers, Iwana)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Melissa Meyers: Return of Service re: Issued Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint with Exhibits A through E, August 13, 2019 Minute Entry upon Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston on 8/21/2019. (Davis, Scott)
August 30, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Iwana Rademaekers on behalf of Defendant Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (ARC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17270476. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John Z Boyle. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-4942-PHX-JZB. Magistrate Election form attached. (ARC)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Melissa Meyers. (Davis, Scott) (ARC)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17270476 filed by Melissa Meyers. (Davis, Scott) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Errata B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meyers v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: Iwana Rademaekers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Meyers
Represented By: Scott Edward Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?