Kuecher v. CBIGG Management LLC
Plaintiff: Leslie Kuecher
Defendant: CBIGG Management LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv04944
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference is set for 11/19/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 501, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Steven P Logan. See order for additional deadlines and details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 10/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(LMR)
October 4, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBIGG Management LLC identifying Corporate Parent C-Bons Group for CBIGG Management LLC. (Dowell, Leigh)
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by CBIGG Management LLC.(Dowell, Leigh)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting a one-time extension of time until 10/4/2019 to respond to complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 9/20/2019. (MMO)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint by CBIGG Management LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dowell, Leigh)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Leigh Eric Dowell on behalf of CBIGG Management LLC. (Dowell, Leigh)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Leslie Kuecher: Proof of Service re: SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION, VERIFIED COMPLAINT, NOTICE TO PARTIES, GENERAL ORDER, MANDATORY INITIAL DISCOVERY, ORDER upon CBIGG Management, LLC on 19.08.06. (Zoldan, Michael)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRELIMINARY ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motion to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. Unless the Court orders otherwise, on November 11, 2019, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 8/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(LMR)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to CBIGG Management LLC. (DLC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17270552. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-4944-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Leslie Kuecher. (Zoldan, Michael) (DLC)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17270552 filed by Leslie Kuecher. (Zoldan, Michael) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuecher v. CBIGG Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBIGG Management LLC
Represented By: Leigh Eric Dowell
Represented By: Ryan Todd Mangum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Kuecher
Represented By: Michael David Zoldan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?