Cristales et al v. Scion Group LLC
Plaintiff: Janelle Cristales and Marianna Carvajal
Defendant: Scion Group LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv04950
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #19 MOTION to Dismiss Case and Compel Arbitration MOTION to Compel MOTION to Stay filed by Scion Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Scion Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Counsel Declaration)(Gallegos, Jessica)
December 20, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #19 MOTION to Dismiss Case and Compel Arbitration MOTION to Compel MOTION to Stay filed by Marianna Carvajal, Janelle Cristales. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Housing Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Janelle Cristales, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Marianna Carvajal, #4 Exhibit D - AAA Commercial Arbitration Fees)(Radbil, Aaron)
November 22, 2019 Filing 19 *MOTION to Dismiss Case, MOTION to Compel Arbitration, MOTION to Stay by Scion Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Scion Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Entrata Declaration)(Gallegos, Jessica). *Added MOTION to Compel, MOTION to Stay on 11/25/2019 (EJA).
November 5, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Senior Judge David G Campbell: Scheduling Conference held on 11/5/2019. If a motion to compel arbitration is going to be filed, it shall be filed no later than 11/22/2019. The response is due 12/20/2019. The reply is due 1/8/2020. The Court does not issue a case management order at this time. If a motion to compel is filed, a case management conference will be set after the ruling is issued. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by Aaron Radbil for Plaintiffs. Ryan Watstein and Jessica Gallegos for Defendant. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) Hearing held 4:31 PM to 4:42 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CLB)
October 31, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #16 Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery filed by Scion Group LLC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RMV)
October 31, 2019 Filing 16 *NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Scion Group LLC. (Gallegos, Jessica) *Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3). Attorney noticed on 11/1/2019 (RMV).
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re: #10 Order, Set/Reset Hearings. The Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 11/1/2019 at 3:30 PM is VACATED and RESET to 11/5/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge David G Campbell. All parties may appear telephonically for the hearing. If the dial-in number previously circulated is changed, counsel shall provide the new dial-in number no later than 12:00 noon on 11/4/2019. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/29/2019. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC, nvo)
October 29, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiffs Marianna Carvajal, Janelle Cristales. (Radbil, Aaron)
October 25, 2019 Filing 13 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) filed by Defendant Scion Group LLC. (Gallegos, Jessica)
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by Scion Group LLC identifying Corporate Parent Scion Group Management Incorporated for Scion Group LLC. (Gallegos, Jessica) *Modified to correct corporate party on 10/3/2019 (EJA).
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Scion Group LLC.(Gallegos, Jessica)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER setting Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 11/1/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 9/4/2019. (DGC, nvo)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting a one-time extension of time until 9/27/2019 to respond to complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 9/4/2019. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC, nvo)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint (First Request) by Scion Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Gallegos, Jessica)
September 3, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Ryan D Watstein, Jessica D Gallegos on behalf of Defendant Scion Group LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 20, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Aaron Radbil on behalf of Plaintiffs Marianna Carvajal, Janelle Cristales. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Marianna Carvajal, Janelle Cristales: Affidavit of Service re: Complaint upon The Scion Group, LLC c/o Gretchen Bracey on 8/16/19. (Radbil, Aaron)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/13/2019. (DGC, nvo)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Scion Group LLC. (ARC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ARC)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17272843. This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-4950-PHX-DGC. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Marianna Carvajal, Janelle Cristales. (Radbil, Aaron) (ARC)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17272843 filed by Janelle Cristales, Marianna Carvajal. (Radbil, Aaron) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cristales et al v. Scion Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scion Group LLC
Represented By: Jessica D Gallegos
Represented By: Ryan D Watstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janelle Cristales
Represented By: Aaron Radbil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marianna Carvajal
Represented By: Aaron Radbil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?