Potts et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Kristen H Potts and Craig K Potts
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv04965
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 16 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Craig K Potts, Kristen H Potts: Proof of Service re: Preliminary Order of Court dated August 22, 2019 upon Attorney General, U.S. Attorney, IRS District Director on 08.25.2019. (Jagiela, John)
September 18, 2019 Filing 15 * SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Craig K Potts, Kristen H Potts: Proof of Service by certified mail re: Summons and Complaint upon IRS District Director AZ on 08/21/19. (Jagiela, John) * Modified to add text and correct service date on 9/19/2019 (LAD).
September 18, 2019 Filing 14 * SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Craig K Potts, Kristen H Potts: Proof of Service by certified mail re: Summons and Complaint upon U.S. Attorneys Office AZ on 08/21/19. (Jagiela, John) * Modified to add text and correct service date on 9/19/2019 (LAD).
September 18, 2019 Filing 13 * SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Craig K Potts, Kristen H Potts: Proof of Service by certified mail re: Summons upon U.S. Attorney General on 09/05/2019. (Jagiela, John) * Modified to add text and correct service date on 9/19/2019 (LAD).
August 25, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of John Jagiela of Service on Defendant of Court Order dated August 22, 2019 by Plaintiffs Craig K Potts, Kristen H Potts. (Jagiela, John)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. Unless the Court orders otherwise, on November 13, 2019, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 8/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(LMR)
August 18, 2019 Filing 10 * SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Craig K Potts, Kristen H Potts: Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons and Complaint Served by U.S. Certified Mail upon U.S. Attorney General on 08/18/2019. (Jagiela, John) * Modified to reflect proof of delivery/service not attached; attorney noticed on 8/19/2019 (LAD).
August 18, 2019 Filing 9 * SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Craig K Potts, Kristen H Potts: Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons and Complaint Served by U.S. Certified Mail upon Internal Revenue Service on 08/18/2019. (Jagiela, John) * Modified to reflect proof of service/delivery not attached on 8/19/2019 (LAD).
August 18, 2019 Filing 8 * SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Craig K Potts, Kristen H Potts: Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons and Complaint Served by U.S. Certified Mail upon U.S. Attorneys Office AZ on 08/18/2019. (Jagiela, John) * Modified to reflect proof of delivery not attached on 8/19/2019 (LAD).
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAS)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Submitted by Craig K Potts, Kristen H Potts. (Jagiela, John)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Submitted by Craig K Potts, Kristen H Potts. (Jagiela, John)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Submitted by Craig K Potts, Kristen H Potts. (Jagiela, John)
August 15, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for John S Jagiela on behalf of Plaintiffs Craig K Potts, Kristen H Potts. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAR)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17284089. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P. Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 19-04965-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAR)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17284089 filed by Craig K Potts, Kristen H Potts. (Jagiela, John) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Potts et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen H Potts
Represented By: John S Jagiela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig K Potts
Represented By: John S Jagiela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?