Maschke v. Devine et al
Plaintiff: Jeremy Allen Maschke
Defendant: Maricopa County Sheriff's Office, Unknown Devine and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2019cv04972
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John Z Boyle (PS)
Referring Judge: John Z Boyle
2 Judge: Michael T Liburdi
3 Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Jeremy Allen Maschke. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 10/4/2019. (SST)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER (Service Packet): Plaintiff's second Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. #8 ) is granted. As required by the accompanying Order to the appropriate government agency, Plaintiff must pay the $350.00 filing fee and is not assessed an initial partial filing fee. The retaliation and discrimination claims in Count One, Count Two, and Count Three are dismissed without prejudice. Defendant Devine must answer the excessive force claim in Count One. Within 120 days from the filing date of this Order, Plaintiff must file a "Notice of Substitution," substituting Defendants Coworker SRT Officers 1 and 2's actual names. The Court may dismiss without prejudice Defendants Coworker SRT Officers 1 and 2 if Plaintiff fails to timely file a notice of substitution, unless Plaintiff seeks and is granted an extension of time. The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff this Order, and a copy of the Marshal's Process Receipt & Return form (USM-285) and Notice of Lawsuit & Request for Waiver of Service of Summons form for Defendant Devine. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge John Z. Boyle pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1). (See Order for further details.) Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 10/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Service Letter, #2 Service Packet, #3 Rule 4, #4 General Order 14-17) (SST)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: This case is reassigned to Judge Michael T. Liburdi. All future filings shall reflect the following case number: CV-19-4972-PHX-MTL (JZB). All pending hearings and/or deadlines are AFFIRMED unless reset by separate order. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jeremy Allen Maschke. (SST) (9 pages)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jeremy Allen Maschke. (SST) (2 pages)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE: This case is subject to electronic filing. Please review the attached documents. (SST)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PARTY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jeremy Allen Maschke: #119106, ASPC Lewis, Stiner Unit, PO Box 3100, Buckeye, AZ 85326. (SST) (1 page)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. #2 ) is denied without prejudice. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. If Plaintiff fails to either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. The Clerk of Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Non-Habeas). (See Order for further details.) Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 8/19/2019. (SST)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (LAD)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jeremy Allen Maschke. (LAD) (4 pages)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jeremy Allen Maschke. (LAD) (2 pages)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Jeremy Allen Maschke. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (LAD) (6 pages)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maschke v. Devine et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Devine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Allen Maschke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?