Mason #240482 v. Ryan et al
Plaintiff: Nathan Sterling Mason
Defendant: Unknown Whiting, Nichole Johnson, Unknown Vance, Unknown Garcia, Ronald Lee, Doug Ducey, Corizon Healthcare Incorporated, Unknown Wade, Unknown Ende, Unknown Parties, Charles L Ryan, Renaud, Cook, Drury, Mesaros PA, Unknown Kila, Unknown Weiss, Ronald Abbl, Joseph Scott Conlon, Jaymond Williams, Unknown Kaufman, Sarah Schade, Brian Page, Unknown Taylor, Arizona, State of, Unknown Evans, Centurion, Unknown Vargas, Unknown McCain, Mary-Ellen Ohshita, Unknown Party, Randall Lowe, Michelle Lombino, Unknown Hernandez and Greg Cortez
Case Number: 2:2019cv04987
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michelle H Burns (PS)
Referring Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 22 SEALED LODGED Proposed Notice to the Court re: #21 MOTION to Seal Document. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Nathan Sterling Mason. (SLQ) (11 pages).
October 7, 2019 Filing 21 * MOTION to Seal Notice to the Court by Nathan Sterling Mason. (SLQ) (1 page). *Modified text on 10/7/2019 (SLQ).
September 23, 2019 Filing 20 SUPPLEMENT re: #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Nathan Sterling Mason. (10 pages) (REK)
September 23, 2019 Filing 19 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ronald Abbl, Arizona, State of, Centurion, Greg Cortez, Doug Ducey, Unknown Ende, Unknown Evans, Unknown Garcia, Unknown Hernandez, Unknown Kaufman, Unknown Kila, Ronald Lee, Michelle Lombino, Randall Lowe, Unknown McCain, Mary-Ellen Ohshita, Charles L Ryan, Unknown Taylor, Unknown Parties, Unknown Party, Unknown Vance, Unknown Vargas, Unknown Wade, Unknown Weiss, Unknown Whiting, Jaymond Williams filed by Nathan Sterling Mason. (19 pages) (REK)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Nathan Sterling Mason. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 9/11/19. (SLQ)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - Plaintiff's first Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. #2 ) is granted. Plaintiff's second Application to Proceed (Doc. #11 ) is denied as duplicative. The Clerk of Court must change the docket to reflect that the "First Amended Complaint" (Doc. #10 ) is a "Notice of Filing of First Amended Complaint." Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a clean version of the amended complaint (without brackets and strike-throughs).(See document for complete details). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 9/11/19. (SLQ)
September 9, 2019 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Nathan S. Mason - Supplement Evidence for Pending Emergency Injunctive Relief Motions re: #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Nathan Sterling Mason. (SLQ) (2 pages).
September 9, 2019 Filing 15 *DECLARATION of Nathan S. Mason - Supplement Evidence for Pending Motions for Emergency Injunctive Relief re: #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Nathan Sterling Mason. (SLQ) (14 pages). *Modified text on 9/9/2019 (SLQ).
September 9, 2019 Filing 14 SEALED LODGED Proposed Supplemental Evidence to Support Motions for Order of Protection and Other Preliminary Relief Requested on an Expedited / Emergency Basis re: #13 MOTION to Seal Document. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Nathan Sterling Mason. (MAP)
September 9, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Seal Supplemental Evidence to Support Motions for Order of Protection and Other Preliminary Relief Requested on an Expedited / Emergency Basis by Nathan Sterling Mason. (MAP)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Nathan Sterling Mason. (9 pages) (REK)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Nathan Sterling Mason. (2 pages) (REK)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 *NOTICE of Filing First Amended Complaint against Ronald Abbl, Arizona, State of, Centurion, Doug Ducey, Unknown Ende, Unknown Evans, Unknown Garcia, Unknown Kaufman, Unknown Kila, Ronald Lee, Michelle Lombino, Randall Lowe, Unknown McCain, Mary-Ellen Ohshita, Charles L Ryan, Unknown Taylor, Unknown Parties, Unknown Party, Unknown Vance, Unknown Vargas, Unknown Wade, Unknown Weiss, Unknown Whiting, Jaymond Williams filed by Nathan Sterling Mason. (45 pages) (REK) *Modified per order #17 on 9/11/2019 (SLQ).
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 *NOTICE re: to the Court Regarding Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Nathan Sterling Mason re: #11 Amended APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (2 pages) (REK) *Modified to correct document link on 8/27/2019 (REK).
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Emergency Ruling Requested) by Nathan Sterling Mason. (3 pages) (REK)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Emergency Expedited Ruling Requested) by Nathan Sterling Mason. (4 pages) (REK)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE: This case is subject to electronic filing. Please review the attached documents. (REK)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (REK)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Nathan Sterling Mason. (4 pages) (REK)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Nathan Sterling Mason. (8 pages) (REK)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Nathan Sterling Mason. (2 pages) (REK)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Nathan Sterling Mason. (58 pages) (REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mason #240482 v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Whiting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nichole Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Ducey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Healthcare Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Ende
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renaud, Cook, Drury, Mesaros PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Kila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Abbl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Scott Conlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaymond Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Schade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centurion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Vargas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown McCain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary-Ellen Ohshita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Lombino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Cortez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Sterling Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?