Wolf v. Discover Financial Services Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Joan Wolf
Defendant: Sarah R Marmor, Scharf Banks Marmor LLC and Discover Financial Services Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv04989
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Deborah M Fine
Referring Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for Wednesday, 11/13/2019 at 03:30 PM, in Courtroom 503. Counsel shall jointly file their Proposed Case Management Plan with the Clerk of the Court not less than ten (10) days before the Scheduling Conference. See attached order for additional information. Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 10/18/2019. (RMW)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Stipulation such that Defendants Scharf, Banks, Marmor, LLC and Sarah R. Marmor shall have up to and including 11/1/2019 to file their responsive pleading to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. There will be no further extensions of this deadline. Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 10/18/2019. (RMW)
October 18, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #12 Amended Complaint by Sarah R Marmor, Scharf Banks Marmor LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Proffitt, Spencer)
October 18, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Spencer T. Proffitt and Kurt M. Zitzer appearing for Sarah R Marmor, Scharf Banks Marmor LLC. . (Proffitt, Spencer)
October 16, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Discover Financial Services Incorporated. (Leslie, Misty)
October 16, 2019 Filing 17 Discover Financial Services' ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint by Discover Financial Services Incorporated.(Leslie, Misty)
October 11, 2019 Filing 16 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Joan Wolf: Proof of Service re: summons, amended complaint, court orders upon Discover Financial Services Inc on 09/25/2019. (Tate, Elizabeth)
September 24, 2019 Filing 15 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #12 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Joan Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 3)(Tate, Elizabeth)
September 13, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Scharf Banks Marmor LLC. (WLP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Submitted by Joan Wolf. (Tate, Elizabeth)
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Discover Financial Services Incorporated, Sarah R Marmor, Scharf Banks Marmor LLC filed by Joan Wolf.(Tate, Elizabeth)
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Joan Wolf . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Tate, Elizabeth)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED, if not already accomplished prior to the date of this Order, that Plaintiff(s) shall effect service of the Complaint and Summons upon all Defendants no later than 90 days after the filing of the Complaint. The parties must comply with Gen. Ord. No. 17-08 (D. Ariz. Apr. 14, 2017) regarding the mandatory initial discovery responses. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve Defendant(s) with a copy of this Order. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 9/10/19. (GMP)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge James A. Teilborg. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-19-4989-PHX-JAT. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for October 7. 2019 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order that Joan Wolf show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 10/7/2019 at 04:30 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Discover Financial Services Incorporated, Sarah R Marmor, Scharf Banks Marmor LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(ARC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ARC)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17300058. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Deborah M Fine. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-4989-PHX-DMF. Magistrate Election form attached. (ARC)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Joan Wolf. (Tate, Elizabeth) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(ARC)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17300058 filed by Joan Wolf. (Tate, Elizabeth) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolf v. Discover Financial Services Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Wolf
Represented By: Elizabeth Diane Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah R Marmor
Represented By: Spencer Thomas Proffitt
Represented By: Kurt M Zitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scharf Banks Marmor LLC
Represented By: Spencer Thomas Proffitt
Represented By: Kurt M Zitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discover Financial Services Incorporated
Represented By: Robert Shawn Oller
Represented By: Misty Leslie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?