Pizer et al v. Rush Auto Recyclers Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Brian Pizer and Daniel Noble
Defendant: Rush Auto Recyclers Incorporated, Dan Rush, Janet Rush and John Radonovich
Case Number: 2:2019cv05019
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #18 Answer to Complaint filed by Janet Rush, Rush Auto Recyclers Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ)
October 15, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint by Janet Rush, Rush Auto Recyclers Incorporated.(Gittler, Amy)
October 15, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint Dan Rush's Answer to First Amended Complaint by Dan Rush.(Coffman, Dale)
October 10, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE re: Notice Of Employee Election to Opt-In by Daniel Noble, Brian Pizer . (Foster, Troy)
October 2, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/29/2019 at 4:30 PM is RESET IN TIME ONLY. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference reset for 10/29/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting a one-time extension of time until 10/14/2019 for Defendants Janet Rush and Rush Auto Recyclers Incorporated to respond to complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 9/8/2019. (MMO)
September 17, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Janet Rush, Rush Auto Recyclers Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gittler, Amy)
September 17, 2019 Filing 12 WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT re: #9 Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Daniel Noble, Brian Pizer. (Foster, Troy)
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT re: #9 Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Daniel Noble, Brian Pizer. (Foster, Troy)
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Daniel Noble, Brian Pizer . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Foster, Troy)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Brian Pizer, Daniel Noble.(Foster, Troy)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 *NOTICE of Service filed by Brian Pizer, Daniel Noble. (Foster, Troy) *Modified to correct event and to add additional filer; attorney noticed on 8/28/2019 (SST).
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/29/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. The parties are directed to meet and confer at least 14 days before the Scheduling Conference as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 8/26/2019. (MMO)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 8/26/2019. (MMO)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Janet Rush, Rush Auto Recyclers Incorporated. (Gittler, Amy)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Rush Auto Recyclers Incorporated. (MCO)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17314539. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-5019-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
August 22, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED : Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 8/6/2019 to Rush Auto Recyclers Incorporated and Jane Rush. (MCO) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019 010953. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17314539 filed by Janet Rush, Rush Auto Recyclers Incorporated. (Gittler, Amy) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pizer et al v. Rush Auto Recyclers Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rush Auto Recyclers Incorporated
Represented By: James Alexander Dattilo
Represented By: Amy Jo Gittler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Rush
Represented By: Samuel Coffman
Represented By: Dale Samuel Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Rush
Represented By: James Alexander Dattilo
Represented By: Amy Jo Gittler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Radonovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Pizer
Represented By: Troy Patrick Foster
Represented By: Kenneth Michael Frakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Noble
Represented By: Troy Patrick Foster
Represented By: Kenneth Michael Frakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?