Ajqui-Macario v. Figueroa et al
Petitioner: Juana Ajqui-Macario
Respondent: Enrique Lucero, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement Agency, Department of Homeland Security, Kevin McAleenan, Jason Ciliberti, William Barr and Fred Figueroa
Case Number: 2:2019cv05064
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John Z Boyle (PS)
Referring Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Alien Detainee - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED : Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons/Complaint/Order upon William Barr on 10/21/19. (MSA)
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED : Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons, Petition, Mot for Prelim Inj upon Fred Figueroa on 10/10/2019. (RMV)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Juana Ajqui-Macario: Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons, Petition, Mot for Prelim Inj upon Jason Ciliberti, Asst Director, ICE on 10/10/19, US Attorney for District of Arizona on 10/11/19, Enrique Lucero, Field Officer for IC on 10/10/19 (1 page). (SJF)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Respondents DHS and ICE are dismissed from this action. The Clerk of Court must promptly serve: a copy of the Summons, the #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, the #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, and this Order upon the United States Attorney for the District of Arizona by certified mail addressed to the civil process clerk at the office of the United States Attorney pursuant to Rule 4(i)(1)(A) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Clerk of Court must also send by certified mail a copy of the Summons, the Petition, the Motion for Preliminary Injunction, and this Order to the United States Attorney General pursuant to Rule 4(i)(1)(B) and to Respondents pursuant to Rule 4(i)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See document for further details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 10/8/19. (GMP)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241) filed by Juana Ajqui-Macario. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Juana Ajqui-Macario. (Belous, Laura) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MCO)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (MCO)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241). Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number 0970-173411 filed by Juana Ajqui-Macario. (Belous, Laura) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ajqui-Macario v. Figueroa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Enrique Lucero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US Immigration and Customs Enforcement Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jason Ciliberti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Fred Figueroa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Juana Ajqui-Macario
Represented By: Laura Belous
Represented By: Katharine Elizabeth Ruhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?