Wise v. Ryan et al
Petitioner: Danny Wise
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Arizona and Charles L Ryan
Case Number: 2:2019cv05076
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Camille D Bibles (PS)
Referring Judge: Camille D Bibles
2 Judge: Michael T Liburdi
3 Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Reconsideration re: #10 Order by Danny Wise. (4 pages) (RMV)
October 25, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Compel Parties to Produce Seized Evidence/Records by Danny Wise. (4 pages) (RMV)
October 10, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: The Clerk's Office having made a clerical error in assigning this case to the Honorable James A. Teilborg, this matter is randomly reassigned to the Honorable Michael T. Liburdi. All future filings shall reflect the following complete case number: CV-19-05076-PHX-MTL (CBD). This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion to Change Judge (Doc. #7 ) is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case be reassigned, by lot, to another District Court Judge in the District of Arizona. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter has been reassigned by random lot to the Honorable James A. Teilborg, United States District Court Judge. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV- 19-05176-PHX-JAT-CDB. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 10/9/19. (LAD)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Petitioner's motion seeking the appointment of counsel at ECF No. #8 is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Respondents' motion at ECF No. #9 is granted. Accordingly, Respondents shall have until December 6, 2019, to docket an answer in response to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (See Order for full details.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles on 10/9/2019. (SST)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254) by Attorney General of the State of Arizona, Charles L Ryan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Knobloch, Eric)
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION (APPLICATION) for Appointment of Counsel by Danny Wise. (LAD) (3 pages)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Change United States District Court Judge by Danny Wise. (SST) (5 pages)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Karl Knobloch on behalf of Attorney General of the State of Arizona, Charles L Ryan. (Knobloch, Eric)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Receipt of Electronic Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Arizona Attorney General on 09/12/19. The Attorney General's Office will file a Notice of Appearance within five (5) business days that identifies the respondents that are represented or, in the alternative, will notify the Court if the Attorney General is not able to accept service for and/or represent any of the named respondents. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Sparks, Jeffrey)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Arizona Attorney General Service Order (2254): Petitioner's #2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is granted. The Clerk of Court must serve a copy of the #1 Petition and this Order on the Respondent(s) and the Attorney General of the State of Arizona by electronic mail pursuant to Rule 4, Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases, and the Memorandum of Understanding between the United States District Clerk of Court for the District of Arizona and the Arizona Attorney General's Office. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Camille D. Bibles pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for further proceedings and a report and recommendation. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 9/12/19. (Attachments: #1 2254 Petition part 1, #2 2254 Petition part 2, #3 2254 Petition part 3, #4 2254 Petition part 4, #5 2254 Petition part 5, #6 2254 Petition part 6, #7 2254 Petition missing page, #8 2254 Petition missing page)(GMP)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (RMV)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Danny Wise. (2 pages) (RMV)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254) filed by Danny Wise. (593 pages) (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Envelope)(RMV) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/10/2019: #7 Missing Page Added, #8 Missing Page Added) (REK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wise v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Represented By: Eric Karl Knobloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles L Ryan
Represented By: Eric Karl Knobloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Danny Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?