Barrington Investments of Arizona LLC v. US Bank National Association et al
Plaintiff: Barrington Investments of Arizona LLC
Defendant: US Bank National Association and Wells Fargo Bank NA
Case Number: 2:2019cv05084
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #14 First MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by US Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Pollock, Bradley)
October 22, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #19 Response to Motion filed by Barrington Investments of Arizona LLC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c) - Documents shall be converted to PDF directly from a word processing program and per Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual must be text searchable. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MSA)
October 21, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re: #14 First MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Barrington Investments of Arizona LLC. (Meyer, Ronald)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion. The October 25, 2019 Rule 16 Case Management Conference and all associated deadlines, including discovery deadlines, set in the Order Setting Rule 16 Case Management Conference (Doc. 10) are vacated pending resolution of Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 14), or by further order of this Court. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 10/16/2019. (TCA)
October 16, 2019 Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Vacate or Continue Case Management Conference by US Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pollock, Bradley)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Stipulation : The deadline for Plaintiff to file a response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss is extended to October 21, 2019. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 10/8/2019. (TCA)
October 2, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION re: #14 First MOTION to Dismiss Case STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO MOTION TO DISMISS by Barrington Investments of Arizona LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order ORDER FOR STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO MOTION TO DISMISS)(Meyer, Ronald)
September 25, 2019 Filing 14 First MOTION to Dismiss Case by US Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Pollock, Bradley)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Defendants deadline to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is extended from September 11, 2019, to September 25, 2019. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 9/10/2019. (TCA)
September 6, 2019 Filing 12 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by US Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Pollock, Bradley)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 9/5/2019. (TCA)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/25/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Susan M Brnovich. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 9/5/2019. (TCA)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by US Bank National Association. (Pollock, Bradley)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Pollock, Bradley)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Barrington Investments of Arizona LLC. (ARC)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Wells Fargo Bank NA. (ARC)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to US Bank National Association. (ARC)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by US Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank NA. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c) - Documents shall be converted to PDF directly from a word processing program and per Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual must be text searchable. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ARC)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ARC)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17350810. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-5084-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-011447. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17350810 filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA, US Bank National Association. (Pollock, Bradley) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(ARC)
September 4, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration, Request for Injunction, Order to Show Cause upon US Bank National Association on 8/15/2019 (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 8/16/2019); Upon Wells Fargo Bank NA on 8/14/2019 (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 8/16/2019) (ARC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barrington Investments of Arizona LLC v. US Bank National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barrington Investments of Arizona LLC
Represented By: Ronald Werner Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank National Association
Represented By: Gregory James Marshall
Represented By: Bradley Ray Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Represented By: Gregory James Marshall
Represented By: Bradley Ray Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?