McCall et al v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: Monroe McCall and Chimyere McCall
Defendant: Unknown Williams, Damon Charles Williams and Unknown Parties
Petitioner: Zene Williams
Case Number: 2:2019cv05126
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Referring Judge: Deborah M Fine
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 23 Summons Issued as to Unknown Williams. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
October 25, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Submitted by Chimyere McCall, Monroe McCall. (Christensen, Rex)
October 25, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #20 Summons Submitted filed by Chimyere McCall, Monroe McCall. Zene Williams is not a listed defendant in this case. Pleas refer to the remark made in the case on 09/09/19. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (WLP)
October 24, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Submitted by Chimyere McCall, Monroe McCall. (Christensen, Rex)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 12/5/2019 at 08:45 AM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Susan M Brnovich. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 10/17/2019. (TCA)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 10/17/2019. (TCA)
October 16, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Susan M Brnovich. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-19-5126-PHX-SMB. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for October 21, 2019 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
October 11, 2019 Filing 16 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
October 11, 2019 Filing 15 *Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) *Modified to Correct Docket Text on 10/16/2019 (MAP).
October 9, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: That counsel having complied with this Court's Order, the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for October 21, 2019 is hereby VACATED as to Chimyere McCall and Monroe McCall. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order that Zene Williams show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 10/21/2019 at 04:30 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order that Damon Charles Williams show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 10/21/2019 at 04:30 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order that Chimyere McCall, Monroe McCall show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 10/21/2019 at 04:30 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER re: Lack of Filing Fee (Attachments: #1 IFP Form)(REK)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (REK)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (REK)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Deborah M. Fine. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-05126-PHX-DMF. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form)(REK)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-090230 filed by Zene Williams, Damon Charles Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Cover Sheet, #4 Envelope)(REK)
September 9, 2019 Remark: The case was removed by Defendant Damon Charles Williams and an individual by the name of Zene Williams. The United States District Court is unable to discern how Zene Williams is involved in this case. Thus Zene Williams has been added as a Movant and a co-filer of the Notice of Removal. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCall et al v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damon Charles Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Zene Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monroe McCall
Represented By: Rex Alden Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chimyere McCall
Represented By: Rex Alden Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?