Valentine v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Juanita Valentine
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv05127
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Juanita Valentine: Notice of Service re: Summons upon William Barr, US Attorney General (09/25/19); Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of the Social Security Administration (09/23/19); Michael Bailey, US Attorney for the District of Arizona (09/20/19) on 09/25/19; 09/23/19; 09/20/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Domestic return receipts and certified mail receipts)(Caldwell, Mark)
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 *NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Wyeth McAdam appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (McAdam, S) *Modified to correct text on 9/27/2019 (REK).
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (BAS)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER issued. See attached Order for deadlines and details. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 9/13/19. (JAMA)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on December 10, 2019. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 9/13/19. (JAMA)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Doc. #2 ) is granted. Plaintiff is responsible for service of the Summons and Complaint on Defendant pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and may serve the Summons and Complaint by waiver under Rule 4(d). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 9/13/19. (LAD)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-5127-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Juanita Valentine. (Caldwell, Mark) (MYE, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Juanita Valentine. (Caldwell, Mark) (MYE, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Juanita Valentine. (Caldwell, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MYE, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valentine v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Valentine
Represented By: Mark Ross Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?