Harris #113830 v. Shinn et al
Petitioner: Jason Lee Harris
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Arizona, Charles L Ryan and David Shinn
Case Number: 2:2019cv05147
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michelle H Burns (PS)
Referring Judge: Michelle H Burns
2 Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE re: Civil Action in Maricopa County Superior Court by Jason Lee Harris. (25 pages) (REK)
November 4, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jillian Brittany Francis on behalf of Attorney General of the State of Arizona, David Shinn. (Francis, Jillian)
October 31, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Receipt of Electronic Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Arizona Attorney General on 10/29/19. The Attorney General's Office will file a Notice of Appearance within five (5) business days that identifies the respondents that are represented or, in the alternative, will notify the Court if the Attorney General is not able to accept service for and/or represent any of the named respondents. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Nielsen, Jim)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Arizona Attorney General Service Order (2254): The Clerk of Court must update the docket to reflect that, pursuant to Rule 25(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Director David Shinn is substituted for Charles Ryan as a Respondent. Petitioner's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #7 is granted. Petitioner's motions for an injunction #5 , and evidentiary hearing #6 , to amend the Petition (Docs. #9 - #11 ), and for relief under 28 U.S.C. 2241 #12 are denied. The Clerk of Court must serve a copy of the Petition #1 and this Order on the Respondent(s) and the Attorney General of the State of Arizona bye electronic mail. Respondents must answer the Petition within 40 days of the date of service. Petitioner may file a reply within 30 days from the date of service of the answer. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Michelle H. Burns pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for further proceedings and a report and recommendation. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 10/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254)) (REK)
October 15, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for the U.S. Dist. Court for the Dist. of Arizona to Grant Petitioner Jason Lee Harris Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 2241(c)(3) by Jason Lee Harris. (4 pages) (REK)
October 10, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend/Correct Ground Seven re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254) by Jason Lee Harris. (9 pages) (REK)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Amend/Correct Ground Six re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254) by Jason Lee Harris. (7 pages) (REK)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Amend/Correct Ground Five re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254) by Jason Lee Harris. (11 pages) (REK)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jason Lee Harris. (9 pages) (REK)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jason Lee Harris. (2 pages) (REK)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for an Evidentiary Hearing on the Cognizable Claim of a Confinement of the Petitioner in Violation of Constitutional Law by Jason Lee Harris. (4 pages) (REK)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Injunction by Jason Lee Harris. (6 pages) (REK)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE: This case is subject to electronic filing. Please review the attached documents. (SLQ)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (SLQ)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jason Lee Harris. (SLQ) (2 pages).
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254) filed by Jason Lee Harris.(SLQ) (26 pages).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris #113830 v. Shinn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jason Lee Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Represented By: Jillian Brittany Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Shinn
Represented By: Jillian Brittany Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?