Perkins v. Ryan et al
Petitioner: Landry Tinnel Perkins
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Arizona and Charles L Ryan
Case Number: 2:2019cv05199
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: James F Metcalf (PS)
Referring Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - All motions to amend, motions to supplement, motions to stay, motions for evidentiary hearing, motions to expand the record, and the like, seeking to expand the petition, or the record herein, shall be filed within twenty-eight (28) days of the service of Respondents' answer to the Petition. Any reply in support of the Petition must be filed within thirty-five (35) days of the service of Respondents' answer to the Petition. See document for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf on 11/12/2019. (RMV)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 *NOTICE of Appearance by Mariette Susan Spence Ambri on behalf of Attorney General of the State of Arizona, David Shinn. (Ambri, Mariette) *Modified to correct the filer on 11/8/2019 (GMP).
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Receipt of Electronic Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Arizona Attorney General on 11/05/9. The Attorney General's Office will file a Notice of Appearance within five (5) business days that identifies the respondents that are represented or, in the alternative, will notify the Court if the Attorney General is not able to accept service for and/or represent any of the named respondents. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Sparks, Jeffrey)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Arizona Attorney General Service Order (2254) - Pursuant to Rule 25(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Director David Shinn is substituted for Charles Ryan as a Respondent. The Clerk of Court must serve a copy of the #1 Petition and this Order on the Respondent(s) and the Attorney General of the State of Arizona by electronic mail pursuant to Rule 4, Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases, and the Memorandum of Understanding between the United States District Clerk of Court for the District of Arizona and the Arizona Attorney General's Office. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge James F. Metcalf pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for further proceedings and a report and recommendation. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 11/4/19. (Attachments: #1 2254 Petition)(GMP)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (GMP)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254). Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number PHX212205 filed by Landry Tinnel Perkins. (40 pages) (Attachments: #1 envelope)(GMP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perkins v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Landry Tinnel Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?