Scottsdale Gas Company LLC v. Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC et al
Plaintiff: Scottsdale Gas Company LLC
Defendant: Treasure Franchise Company LLC and Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv05291
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Referring Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Commerce
Cause of Action: 15:2801
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Scottsdale Gas Company LLC, Counter Defendant Scottsdale Gas Company LLC. (Jones, Stephen)
November 12, 2019 Filing 20 PLAINTIFF/COUNTERDEFENDANT'S REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM ANSWER to #18 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Scottsdale Gas Company LLC.(Jones, Stephen)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference is set for 12/13/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 501, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Steven P Logan. See order for additional deadlines and detsils. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 10/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(LMR)
October 23, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Scottsdale Gas Company LLC by Treasure Franchise Company LLC, Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC.(Kartchner, Todd)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that the Plaintiff's request for a preliminary injunction set forth in the Plaintiff's Application for Temporary Restraining Order Without Notice and Preliminary Injunction #10 is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the temporary restraining order implemented by the Court's Order #11 is lifted. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 10/11/2019. (REK)
October 10, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Steven P Logan: Hearing on Plaintiff's Application for Temporary Restraining Order Without Notice and Preliminary Injunction #10 is held on 10/10/2019. Argument is presented. The matter is taken under advisement. APPEARANCES: Stephen Reeves and Todd Kartchner for Plaintiff. Todd Kartchner for Defendants (Court Reporter Elva Cruz-Lauer.) Hearing held 1:34 PM to 2:16 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LMR)
October 8, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #10 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order WITHOUT NOTICE filed by Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC, Treasure Franchise Company LLC. (Kartchner, Todd)
October 8, 2019 Filing 14 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Scottsdale Gas Company LLC: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Availability of United States Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Preliminary Order, Mandatory Initial Discovery User Manual for the District of Arizona, Notice to Parties - Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project, Complaint upon Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC on 10/2/2019. (Jones, Stephen)
October 8, 2019 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Scottsdale Gas Company LLC: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Availability of United States Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Preliminary Order, Mandatory Initial Discovery User Manual for the District of Arizona, Notice to Parties - Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project, Complaint upon Treasure Franchise Company, LLC on 10/2/2019. (Jones, Stephen)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRELIMINARY ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motion to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. Unless the Court orders otherwise, on December 31, 2019, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 10/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(LMR)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Plaintiff's Application for Temporary Restraining Order Without Notice and Preliminary Injunction #10 is granted. Defendants shall continue their relationship with Plaintiff as a supplier of gasoline and with respect to the processing of credit cards in the same manner as before Defendants sought to terminate the Contractor Dealer Gasoline Agreement dated June 12, 2006. Defendants Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC and Treasure Franchise Company LLC must file a response to Plaintiff's Application for Temporary Restraining Order Without Notice and Preliminary Injunction #10 no later than 5:00 p.m. on Tuesday, October 8, 2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED setting a hearing on Plaintiff's Application for Temporary Restraining Order Without Notice and Preliminary Injunction #10 on Thursday, October 10, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. before the Honorable Judge Steven P. Logan, United States District Judge, in the Sandra Day O'Connor United States Courthouse, located at 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, Arizona 85003, 5th Floor, Courtroom 501. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 10/04/2019. (REK)
October 3, 2019 Filing 10 *First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order without Notice and Preliminary Injunction by Scottsdale Gas Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Affidavit Affidavit of Mohamed Sweillam, #5 Exhibit Exhibits to Affidavit, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Jones, Stephen) *Modified to remove incorrect "Ex Parte" Designation on 10/4/2019 (REK).
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER reassigning this case to Judge Logan for all further proceedings. All future pleadings shall bear the following case caption: CV-19-05291-PHX-SPL. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 10/02/2019. (REK)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order and its Attachments on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on December 31, 2019, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; 3. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, the parties shall file with the Clerk of Court a notice of service of MIDP Responses, supplemental MIDP Responses, and production of ESI, rather than copies of the actual disclosures [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 10/1/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice - MIDP, #2 MIDP User Manual)(MAW)
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Scottsdale Gas Company LLC. (Jones, Stephen)
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC, Treasure Franchise Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(KEP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Scottsdale Gas Company LLC. (KEP)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17460383. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W. Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-5291-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Scottsdale Gas Company LLC. (Jones, Stephen) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(KEP)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17460383 filed by Scottsdale Gas Company LLC. (Jones, Stephen) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scottsdale Gas Company LLC v. Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treasure Franchise Company LLC
Represented By: Todd Stephen Kartchner
Represented By: David Andrew Timchak
Represented By: John M Pearce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC
Represented By: Todd Stephen Kartchner
Represented By: David Andrew Timchak
Represented By: John M Pearce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scottsdale Gas Company LLC
Represented By: Stephen Gregory Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?