Singh v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Raghuveer Singh
Respondent: Enrique Lucero, James McHenry, William Barr, Kevin K McAleenan and Sean Keenan
Case Number: 2:2019cv05314
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John Z Boyle (PS)
Referring Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Alien Detainee - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Remark: 1 Disk - as outlined in the Respondents Notice re: Filing Non-Electronic Exhibit 8 to Respondents Answer to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #16 has been received, and will be stored in the Phoenix file room. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (HLA)
November 6, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE re: Filing Exhibit 8 to Respondents' Answer to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by William Barr, Enrique Lucero, Kevin K McAleenan re: #15 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief . (Attachments: #1 Index of Non-ECF Filed Exhibits)(Morrison, Kristina)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion. Respondents shall file the non-electronic exhibit identified in Doc. 13 with the Clerk of Court, and provide a copy to Petitioner, in accordance with the Courts Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual II(N)(2). Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 11/6/2019. (TCA)
November 5, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by William Barr, Enrique Lucero, Kevin K McAleenan. (Morrison, Kristina)
November 5, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to File Non-ECF Item (Audio Recordings on CD) re: #12 Response to Habeas Petition (Fed/2241) by William Barr, Enrique Lucero, Kevin K McAleenan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Morrison, Kristina)
November 5, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241) by William Barr, Enrique Lucero, Kevin K McAleenan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-8)(Morrison, Kristina)
October 29, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF EMAIL ADDRESS by Marshall G Whitehead. (Whitehead, Marshall)
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED : Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons/Complaint/Order upon US Attorney General on 10/15/19. (MSA)
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED : Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons, Petition, Mot for TRO and Prelim Inj upon William Barr on 10/12/2019. (RMV)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Raghuveer Singh: Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons, Petition, Mot for TRO and Prelim Inj upon US Attorney, District of Arizona on 10/8/19 (1 page). (SJF)
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED : Certified Mail Receipt re: Petition, Motion, Order, Summons upon Enrique Lucero on 10/8/19. (GMP)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - A temporary stay of removal is granted. Respondents are enjoined from removing Petitioner Raghuveer Singh (A# 203-674-055) from the United States pending further order of this Court. Petitioner's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and/or Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. #2 ) is denied in part as to Petitioner's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Respondents McHenry and Keenan are dismissed without prejudice. Respondents Barr, McAleenan, and Lucero shall have 30 days from the date of service to file a Response to Petitioner's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #2 ). Petitioner shall have 15 days from the filing of Respondents' Response to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction to file a Reply. See order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 10/4/19. (NKS)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (ARC)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Raghuveer Singh. (Whitehead, Marshall) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(ARC)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Raghuveer Singh. (Whitehead, Marshall) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(ARC)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241). Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number 0970-17473461 filed by Raghuveer Singh. (Whitehead, Marshall) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix Exhibit Index, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Raghuveer Singh
Represented By: Marshall G Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Enrique Lucero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James McHenry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin K McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sean Keenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?