Ulta-Lit Tree Company v. Simple Living Solutions LLC
Plaintiff: Ulta-Lit Tree Company
Defendant: Simple Living Solutions LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv05340
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Camille D Bibles
Referring Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Counter Claimant Simple Living Solutions LLC, Defendant Simple Living Solutions LLC. (Kasarjian, Kevin)
December 2, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Ulta-Lit Tree Company. (Jones, Jacob)
November 25, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Ulta-Lit Tree Company. (Jones, Jacob)
November 22, 2019 Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER: Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. An answer, amended complaint, or other pleading #20 has been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document.If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form.If there are no changes to the copyright, trademark, or patent information previously submitted for this case, then the party who filed the above document must file a Notice, within seven (7) days, indicating such using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header (REK)
November 21, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #15 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Ulta-Lit Tree Company's Answer to Counterclaim by Ulta-Lit Tree Company.(Jones, Jacob)
November 7, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Simple Living Solutions LLC. (Kasarjian, Kevin)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER setting a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 1/23/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 11/1/2019. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
November 1, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER: Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. An answer, amended complaint, or other pleading (Doc. #15 ) has been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document.If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form.If there are no changes to the copyright, trademark, or patent information previously submitted for this case, then the party who filed the above document must file a Notice, within seven (7) days, indicating such using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header (LFIG)
October 31, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Simple Living Solutions LLC. (Kasarjian, Kevin)
October 31, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Ulta-Lit Tree Company by Simple Living Solutions LLC.(Kasarjian, Kevin)
October 22, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE re: Service of the Court's October 21, 2019 Order on Defendant by Ulta-Lit Tree Company re: #13 Order re Rule 12(b) Motions . (Jones, Jacob)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 10/21/2019. (LFIG)
October 21, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Justin D Swindells on behalf of Plaintiff Ulta-Lit Tree Company. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 18, 2019 Filing 12 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
October 18, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Diane J Humetewa. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-19-5340-PHX-DJH. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
October 15, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Richard Henry Tilghman, IV on behalf of Plaintiff Ulta-Lit Tree Company. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 15, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Angelo John Christopher on behalf of Plaintiff Ulta-Lit Tree Company. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 14, 2019 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Ulta-Lit Tree Company: Proof of Service re: Summons upon Simple Living Solutions, LLC on 10/10/19. (Jones, Jacob)
October 14, 2019 Filing 8 *NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information by Plaintiff Ulta-Lit Tree Company. (Jones, Jacob) *Modified to correct event type on 10/15/2019 (EJA).
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Simple Living Solutions LLC. (DLC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(DLC)
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17489433. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Camille D Bibles. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-5340-PHX-CDB. Magistrate Election form attached. (DLC)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Ulta-Lit Tree Company. (Jones, Jacob) (DLC)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ulta-Lit Tree Company. (Jones, Jacob) (DLC)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17489433 filed by Ulta-Lit Tree Company. (Jones, Jacob) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ulta-Lit Tree Company v. Simple Living Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simple Living Solutions LLC
Represented By: Kevin Michael Kasarjian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ulta-Lit Tree Company
Represented By: Richard Henry Tilghman, IV
Represented By: Jacob Christensen Jones
Represented By: David Gary Barker
Represented By: Justin D Swindells
Represented By: Adam Elliott Lang
Represented By: Angelo J Christopher
Represented By: Angelo John Christopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?