Government Employees Insurance Company et al v. 808 Auto Glass LLC et al
Plaintiff: GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company and Government Employees Insurance Company
Defendant: A&E Solheim LLC, Nicholas Minard, Jesse Pacheco, 808 Auto Glass LLC, Eric A Solheim, Anna M Solheim, Lightning Capital LLC and A&E Solheim LLC doing business as A&E Auto Glass
Case Number: 2:2019cv05343
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting a one-time extension of time for Defendants Lightning Capital, L.L.C. and Nicholas Minard to respond to complaint of 12/18/19. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 11/12/19. (MSA)
November 8, 2019 Filing 22 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT FOR DEFENDANTS LIGHTNING CAPITAL, L.L.C. AND NICHOLAS MINARD by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Acceptance of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order regarding Stipulation Acknowledging Service and Extend Time to Respond)(Thorpe, William)
November 8, 2019 Filing 21 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 11/8/2019 to Paul G. Johnson, as counsel for Defendants Lightning Capital, L.L.C. . (Thorpe, William)
November 7, 2019 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lightning Capital LLC, Nicholas Minard. (Johnson, Paul)
November 7, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul G Johnson on behalf of Lightning Capital LLC, Nicholas Minard. (Johnson, Paul)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting a one-time extension of time until 12/18/19 to respond to complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 11/7/19. (MSA)
November 7, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint by A&E Solheim LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Propsed Order)(Ricciardi, Alfred)
October 30, 2019 Filing 16 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company: Proof of Service re: Summons in a Civil Action, Notice to All Parties - Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project, Complaint, Notice of Errata upon Jesse Pacheco on 10/17/19. (Thorpe, William)
October 30, 2019 Filing 15 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company: Proof of Service re: Summons in a Civil Action, Notice to All Parties - Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project, Complaint, Notice of Errata upon Eric Solheim on 10/17/19. (Thorpe, William)
October 30, 2019 Filing 14 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company: Proof of Service re: Summons in a Civil Action, Notice to All Parties - Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project, Complaint, Notice of Errata upon Anna M. Solheim on 10/17/19. (Thorpe, William)
October 30, 2019 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company: Proof of Service re: Summons in a Civil Action, Notice to All Parties - Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project, Complaint, Notice of Errata upon A&E Solheim, LLC d/b/a A&E Auto Glass on Anna Solheim (Member) on 10/17/19. (Thorpe, William)
October 30, 2019 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company: Proof of Service re: Summons in a Civil Action, Notice to All Parties - Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project, Complaint, Notice of Errata upon 808 Auto Glass LLC c/o Jesse Pacheco (Statutory Agent) on 10/17/19. (Thorpe, William)
October 17, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Barry I Levy, Max Saulter Gershenoff, Steven Henesy, and Michael Vanunu on behalf of Plaintiffs GEICO Indemnity Company, and Government Employees Insurance Company. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Errata re: #1 Complaint Notice of Errata by Plaintiffs GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Errata)(Thorpe, William)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER/NOTICE PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P. 4(m) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on January 6, 2020. (See document for further details). Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 10/8/19. (LAD)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to 808 Auto Glass LLC, A&E Solheim LLC, Lightning Capital LLC, Nicholas Minard, Jesse Pacheco, Eric A Solheim, Anna M Solheim. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17491501. This case has been assigned to the Honorable G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-5343-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Submitted by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Thorpe, William) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(MCO)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Government Employees Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Automotive Incorporated, Corporate Parent Geico Corporation for Government Employees Insurance Company. (Thorpe, William) (MCO)
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Automotive Incorporated, Corporate Parent Geico Corporation for GEICO Indemnity Company. (Thorpe, William) (MCO)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO General Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Automotive Incorporated, Corporate Parent Geico Corporation for GEICO General Insurance Company. (Thorpe, William) (MCO)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Incorporated, Corporate Parent Geico Corporation for GEICO Casualty Company. (Thorpe, William) (MCO)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17491501 filed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Thorpe, William) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Government Employees Insurance Company et al v. 808 Auto Glass LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A&E Solheim LLC
Represented By: Alfred W Ricciardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Minard
Represented By: Paul G Johnson
Represented By: John James Egbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Pacheco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 808 Auto Glass LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric A Solheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna M Solheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lightning Capital LLC
Represented By: Paul G Johnson
Represented By: John James Egbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A&E Solheim LLC doing business as A&E Auto Glass
Represented By: Alfred W Ricciardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Indemnity Company
Represented By: Max Saulter Gershenoff
Represented By: Jamie Gill Santos
Represented By: Steven Henesy
Represented By: William Lee Thorpe
Represented By: Michael Vanunu
Represented By: Barry I Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Casualty Company
Represented By: Max Saulter Gershenoff
Represented By: Jamie Gill Santos
Represented By: Steven Henesy
Represented By: William Lee Thorpe
Represented By: Michael Vanunu
Represented By: Barry I Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: Max Saulter Gershenoff
Represented By: Jamie Gill Santos
Represented By: Steven Henesy
Represented By: William Lee Thorpe
Represented By: Michael Vanunu
Represented By: Barry I Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Company
Represented By: Max Saulter Gershenoff
Represented By: Jamie Gill Santos
Represented By: Steven Henesy
Represented By: William Lee Thorpe
Represented By: Michael Vanunu
Represented By: Barry I Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?