Edwards v. Farmers Insurance
Plaintiff: Stephen S Edwards
Defendant: Farmers Insurance
Case Number: 2:2019cv05389
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MAP)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Assignment. (MAP)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:19-cv-03893 . Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 Interdistrict transfer to District of Arizona, Phoenix Division. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 10/11/19, filed. (rguerrero, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 10/15/2019.]
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to District of Arizona, Phoenix Division (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 10/15/2019.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (LoriPurifoy, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 10/15/2019.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to Receive Electronic Notifications by Stephen S Edwards, filed. (thanniable, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 10/15/2019.]
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/31/2020 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(thanniable, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 10/15/2019.]
October 8, 2019 Initial Filing fee: $400.00 re: #1 Complaint, receipt number HOU091553, filed. (thanniable, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 10/15/2019.]
October 8, 2019 Summons Issued as to Farmers Insurance. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff in person, filed.(thanniable, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 10/15/2019.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Farmers Insurance filed by Stephen S Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(thanniable, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 10/15/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Farmers Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen S Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?