Advanced Reimbursement Solutions LLC et al v. Aetna Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Unknown Parties and Advanced Reimbursement Solutions LLC
Defendant: Aetna Health Incorporated, Aetna Life Insurance Company and Aetna Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv05395
Filed: October 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER pursuant to #13 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint: The deadline for Defendants to file their Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended through and including 12/23/2019. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 11/12/2019. (MMO)
November 12, 2019 Filing 13 *STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint by Aetna Health Incorporated, Aetna Incorporated, Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beauchamp, Keith) *Modified to reflect correct event; attorney noticed on 11/13/2019 (SST).
November 6, 2019 Remark: Out of state attorney Daron Tooch removed as counsel for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 1, 2019 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Advanced Reimbursement Solutions LLC, Unknown Parties: Certificate of Service re: Summons in a Civil Action, Complaint, Notice to All Parties-MIDPP, Notice of Availability of US Magistrate Judge, Order (ERISA case), General Order (17-08), MIDPP Checklist upon Aetna Life Insurance Company on 10/23/2019. (Witthoft, Sara)
November 1, 2019 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Advanced Reimbursement Solutions LLC, Unknown Parties: Certificate of Service re: Summons in a Civil Action, Complaint, Notice to All Parties-MIDPP, Notice of Availability of US Magistrate Judge, Order (ERISA case), General Order (17-08), MIDPP Checklist upon Aetna Incorporated on 10/23/2019. (Witthoft, Sara)
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Advanced Reimbursement Solutions LLC, Unknown Parties: Certificate of Service re: Summons in a Civil Action, Complaint, Notice to All Parties-MIDPP, Notice of Availability of US Magistrate Judge, Order (ERISA case), General Order (17-08), MIDPP Checklist upon Aetna Health Incorporated on 10/23/2019. (Witthoft, Sara)
October 31, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #8 Notice (Other) filed by Advanced Reimbursement Solutions LLC, Unknown Parties. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 5.5(g) - Documents signed by an attorney shall be filed using that attorney's ECF log-in and password and shall not be filed using a log-in and password belonging to another attorney. Document signed by attorney Matthew St Martin but submitted using the log-in and password belonging to attorney Sara Witthoft. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. Please do not refile. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SST)
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 *NOTICE re: Notice of Service of Order (ERISA Case) by Advanced Reimbursement Solutions LLC, Unknown Parties re: #7 Order re Rule 12(b) Motions . (Witthoft, Sara) *Modified to reflect Local Rule violations on 11/1/2019 (SST).
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 10/15/2019. (MMO)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MYE, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Aetna Life Insurance Company, Aetna Incorporated, and Aetna Health Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MYE, ). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
October 12, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17512360. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-5395-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE, )
October 12, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Advanced Reimbursement Solutions LLC and Unknown Parties. (Witthoft, Sara) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MYE, )
October 12, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Advanced Reimbursement Solutions LLC. (Witthoft, Sara) (MYE, )
October 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17512360 filed by Advanced Reimbursement Solutions LLC and Unknown Parties. (Witthoft, Sara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(MYE, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Advanced Reimbursement Solutions LLC et al v. Aetna Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unknown Parties
Represented By: Matthew Tyler St Martin
Represented By: Daron Tooch
Represented By: Sara Rebecca Witthoft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advanced Reimbursement Solutions LLC
Represented By: Matthew Tyler St Martin
Represented By: Daron Tooch
Represented By: Sara Rebecca Witthoft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Health Incorporated
Represented By: Keith Beauchamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Keith Beauchamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Incorporated
Represented By: Keith Beauchamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?