Puleo v. Shinn et al
Petitioner: Steven James Puleo
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Arizona, Charles L Ryan and David Shinn
Case Number: 2:2019cv05402
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Camille D Bibles (PS)
Referring Judge: Camille D Bibles
2 Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Respondents' motion at ECF No. #8 , seeking an extension of the time allowed to answer Petitioner's 2254 petition, is granted and Respondents shall have until January 17, 2020, to docket a response to the habeas petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles on 12/2/2019. (SST)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 *First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254) by Attorney General of the State of Arizona, David Shinn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Crist, Terry) *Modified to remove terminated party as a filer; attorney noticed on 12/2/2019 (SST).
October 31, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Terry Michael Crist, III on behalf of Attorney General of the State of Arizona, Charles L Ryan. (Crist, Terry)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Receipt of Electronic Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Arizona Attorney General on 10/24/19. The Attorney General's Office will file a Notice of Appearance within five (5) business days that identifies the respondents that are represented or, in the alternative, will notify the Court if the Attorney General is not able to accept service for and/or represent any of the named respondents. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Nielsen, Jim)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Arizona Attorney General Service Order (2254): Petitioner's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. #2 ) is denied as moot. Ground Four of the Petition is dismissed. The Clerk of Court must serve a copy of the Petition (Doc. #1 ) and this Order on the Respondent(s) and the Attorney General of the State of Arizona by electronic mail pursuant to Rule 4, Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases, and the Memorandum of Understanding between the United States District Clerk of Court for the District of Arizona and the Arizona Attorney General's Office. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Camille D. Bibles pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for further proceedings and a report and recommendation. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 10/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 2254 Petition) (SST)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number PHX213041. (SJF)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (MSA)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Steven James Puleo. (2 pages) (MSA)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254) filed by Steven James Puleo. (11 pages) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MSA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Puleo v. Shinn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven James Puleo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Represented By: Terry Michael Crist, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles L Ryan
Represented By: Terry Michael Crist, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Shinn
Represented By: Terry Michael Crist, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?