Shumway v. AT&T Mobility LLC
Plaintiff: Ryan Shumway
Defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv05436
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Neil V Wake
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Defense counsel has communicated with the Court with the permission of Plaintiff's counsel, in light of the Court's Order #17 , to mutually reschedule the Case Management Conference. IT IS ORDERED resetting the Case Management Conference from 12/17/2019 at 2:30 p.m. to 12/16/2019 at 3:30 p.m. in Courtroom 401, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior United States District Judge Neil V. Wake. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NVW, vg)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - The Joint Motion to Continue or Vacate Case Management Conference (Doc. #16 ) is denied, without prejudice to submission of a further motion for a rescheduling of a day or two. Defendant's counsel's request to appear by telephone is denied. Signed by Senior Judge Neil V Wake on 12/11/19. (DXD)
December 10, 2019 Filing 16 Joint MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference (First Request) by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Joint Motion to Continue or Vacate Case Management Conference (First Request))(Campbell, Stacey)
December 10, 2019 Filing 15 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Ryan Shumway. (Barton, James)
November 20, 2019 Filing 14 *NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by James Evans Barton, II terminating Saman John Golestan. (Barton, James) *Modified to correct event on 11/20/2019 (RMV).
November 15, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by AT&T Mobility LLC.(Campbell, Stacey)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER setting Case Management Conference for 12/17/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 401, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Neil V Wake. See document for additional deadlines and complete details. Signed by Senior Judge Neil V Wake on 10/28/2019. (RMV)
October 28, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Stacey Alan Campbell on behalf of Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that the parties Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (First Request) (Doc. #10 ) is granted. Defendant shall file its answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. 1-5) no later than November 15, 2019. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Senior Judge Neil V Wake on 10/25/2019. (KFZ)
October 25, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Stipulated Extension of Time)(Campbell, Stacey)
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AT&T Mobility LLC identifying Other Affiliate AT&T Incorporated for AT&T Mobility LLC. (Campbell, Stacey)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #7 Declaration of Diane F. Schwantes by Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit July 27, 2019 Labor Department Arizona Decision)(Campbell, Stacey)
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Diane F. Schwantes in Support of Defendant's Notice of Removal by Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2013 Mobility Orange Labor Agreement)(Campbell, Stacey)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Motions to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. Motions to dismiss that do not contain the required certification are subject to be stricken on the Court's own motion. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge Neil V Wake on 10/21/19. (GMP)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ARC)
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to AT&T Mobility LLC. (ARC)
October 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ARC)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17534758. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Neil V Wake. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-5436-PHX-NVW. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
October 18, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Affidavit of Process re: Summons, Complaint, Certificate upon AT&T Mobility LLC on 9/30/2019. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 10/2/2019) (ARC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-096776. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17534758 filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Campbell, Stacey) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shumway v. AT&T Mobility LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Shumway
Represented By: Saman John Golestan
Represented By: Israel G Torres
Represented By: James Evans Barton, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC
Represented By: Stacey Alan Campbell
Represented By: Luis F Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?