Laake v. Dirty World LLC et al
Plaintiff: John Laake and Winter Laake
Defendant: Dirty World LLC and John Doe
Case Number: 2:2019cv05444
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Deborah M Fine
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER (Service Packet) - IT IS ORDERED granting Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Doc. #2 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Service by waiver of the summons and complaint shall be at government expense on the Defendants by the United States Marshal or his authorized representative. The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet including the Complaint (Doc. #1 ), this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for each Defendant in this matter. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet for The Dirty to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. If Plaintiff does not either obtain a waiver of service of the summons or complete service of the Summons and Complaint on The Dirty within 90 days of the date of this Order, the action may be dismissed as to each Defendant not served. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have 60 days from the date of this Order to move to substitute an identified person in place of John Doe, and if an extension of time for such is sought, Plaintiff must do so in writing. (See document for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 11/25/19. (Note: Service packet letter and blank forms will be sent to Plaintiff by U.S. Mail). (LAD)
November 13, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: That John Lake having complied with this Court's Order, the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for December 2, 2019 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by John Laake. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (EJA)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order that John Laake show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 12/2/2019 at 04:30 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachment(s): #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form) (MAP).
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MSA)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (MSA)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Deborah M Fine. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-05444-PHX-DMF. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: #1 Mag 25 Instructions)(MSA)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by John Laake. (MSA)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by John Lake. (5 pages) (MSA)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by John Lake. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MSA) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/27/2019: #2 missing page 16) (BAS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laake v. Dirty World LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Laake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winter Laake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dirty World LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?