Todeschi v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Brian Todeschi
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, Scottsdale Healthcare Hospitals and Scottsdale Healthcare Hospitals doing business as HonorHealth Long-Term Disability Plan
Case Number: 2:2019cv05463
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Brian Todeschi: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 11/25/2019 to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company . (Counters, Lisa)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Brian Todeschi. Party Scottsdale Healthcare Hospitals terminated. (Counters, Lisa)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 10/23/2019. (LFIG)
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, Scottsdale Healthcare Hospitals. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17545457. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-5463-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Brian Todeschi. (Counters, Lisa) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(MCO)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17545457 filed by Brian Todeschi. (Counters, Lisa) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Todeschi v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottsdale Healthcare Hospitals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottsdale Healthcare Hospitals doing business as HonorHealth Long-Term Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Todeschi
Represented By: Lisa Jeanette Counters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?