Coolpo Licensing LLC v. Festa et al
Plaintiff: Coolpo Licensing LLC
Defendant: Maurizio Sole Festa, VYU360 LLC and Alexis Fernandez
Case Number: 2:2019cv05473
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Referring Judge: Eileen S Willett
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE re: Notice of Service on Defendants by Coolpo Licensing LLC re: #19 Order, Set Deadlines . (Brown, Nathanael)
December 6, 2019 Filing 23 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Coolpo Licensing LLC: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 12/06/2019 to Kenneth M. Motolenich-Salas . (Brown, Nathanael)
November 25, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Certificate of Conferral in Accordance with Court Order (Doc. 19) by Alexis Fernandez, Maurizio Sole Festa, VYU360 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kenneth Motolenich-Salas and Exhibits Thereto with Certificate of Conferral, #2 Affidavit of Alexis Fernandez in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Affidavit of Maurizio Sole Festa in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit Exhibits 1-3 to Declaration of Maurizio Sole Festa in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #5 Exhibit Exhibits 4-12 to Declaration of Maurizio Sole Festa in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Motolenich-Salas, Kenneth)
November 20, 2019 Filing 21 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Coolpo Licensing LLC: Affidavit of Service re: Summons in a Civil Action, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint for Declaratory Judgment of Non-Infringement and Invalidty, Demand for Jury Trial, Notice to Parties, General Order 17-08, Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project Checklist and Exhibits upon VYU360 LLC on 11/05/2019. (Brown, Nathanael)
November 20, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Submitted by Coolpo Licensing LLC, SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Coolpo Licensing LLC: Affidavit of Service re: Summons in a Civil Action, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint for Declaratory Judgment of Non-Infringement and Invalidty, Demand for Jury Trial, Notice to Parties, General Order 17-08, Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project Checklist and Exhibits upon Alexis Fernandez through his wife on 11/05/2019. (Brown, Nathanael)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order and its Attachments on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on January 22, 2020, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; 3. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, the parties shall file with the Clerk of Court a notice of service of MIDP Responses, supplemental MIDP Responses, and production of ESI, rather than copies of the actual disclosures [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 11/18/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice - MIDP, #2 MIDP User Manual)(MAW)
November 14, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Dominic W Lanza. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-19-5473-PHX-DWL. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for December 2, 2019 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
November 13, 2019 Filing 17 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
November 13, 2019 Filing 16 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order that Coolpo Licensing LLC show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 12/2/2019 at 04:30 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
November 13, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VYU360 LLC. (Motolenich-Salas, Kenneth)
November 12, 2019 Filing 11 Magistrate Election Form Deadline set for Alexis Fernandez, Maurizio Sole Festa, VYU360 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MAP)
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Michael Motolenich-Salas on behalf of Alexis Fernandez, Maurizio Sole Festa, VYU360 LLC. (Motolenich-Salas, Kenneth)
October 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Coolpo Licensing LLC. (Brown, Nathanael)
October 27, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Coolpo Licensing LLC identifying Corporate Parent shanghai zhuangshengxiaomeng technology co ltd for Coolpo Licensing LLC. (Brown, Nathanael)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Alexis Fernandez, Maurizio Sole Festa, VYU360 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(KEP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Coolpo Licensing LLC. (KEP)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (KEP)
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17547745. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eileen S. Willett. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-5473-PHX-ESW. Magistrate Election form attached. (KEP)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Coolpo Licensing LLC. (Brown, Nathanael) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(KEP)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17547745 filed by Coolpo Licensing LLC. (Brown, Nathanael) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coolpo Licensing LLC v. Festa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurizio Sole Festa
Represented By: Kenneth Michael Motolenich-Salas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VYU360 LLC
Represented By: Kenneth Michael Motolenich-Salas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexis Fernandez
Represented By: Kenneth Michael Motolenich-Salas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coolpo Licensing LLC
Represented By: Nathanael Melvin Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?