Declements et al v. RE/MAX LLC
Plaintiff: Sam Tuli and Daniel Declements
Defendant: RE/MAX LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv05476
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Neil V Wake
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RE/MAX LLC identifying Corporate Parent RMCO, LLC, Corporate Parent RE/MAX Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent RIHI, Inc. for RE/MAX LLC. (Marshall, Gregory)
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by RE/MAX LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, Gregory)
November 25, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Becca Wahlquist on behalf of Defendant RE/MAX LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Granting the parties' #8 Stipulation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that RE/MAX, LLC has through and including December 23, 2019 to file its response to Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint. No further extension will be granted. Signed by Senior Judge Neil V Wake on 11/13/19. (GMP)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Defendant RE/MAX LLC submit a proposed form of order that is not on law firm stationery, in compliance with Local Rule 7.1(b)(3) re: #8 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NVW, vg)
November 13, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint by RE/MAX LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marshall, Gregory)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Daniel Declements, Sam Tuli: Proof of Service re: Complaint upon Re/Max on 10/24/19. (Kaufman, Avi)
November 1, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Stefan Louis Coleman on behalf of Plaintiffs Daniel Declements and Sam Tuli. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 31, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Avi Kaufman on behalf of Plaintiffs Daniel Declements, Sam Tuli. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 12 (c) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. Therefore, the parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants who have not filed a formal appearance and file notice of service. See document for further details. Signed by Senior Judge Neil V Wake on 10/23/19. (GMP)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to RE/MAX LLC. (MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17549727. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Neil V Wake. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-5476-PHX-NVW. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Daniel Declements, Sam Tuli. (Brown, Nathanael) (MCO)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17549727 filed by Daniel Declements, Sam Tuli. (Brown, Nathanael) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Declements et al v. RE/MAX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Tuli
Represented By: Nathanael Melvin Brown
Represented By: Stefan Louis Coleman
Represented By: Avi Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Declements
Represented By: Nathanael Melvin Brown
Represented By: Stefan Louis Coleman
Represented By: Avi Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RE/MAX LLC
Represented By: Gregory James Marshall
Represented By: Becca Wahlquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?